Akeena Solar, Inc. et al v. Zep Solar Inc et al
Plaintiff: Akeena Solar, Inc. and Andalay Solar Inc
Defendant: Zep Solar Inc, Global Resource Option Inc and High Sun Technology Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv05040
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING 86 Request for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 82 Unopposed Motion to Stay. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 60 Motion to Lift Stay. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISCHARGIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND 1) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY ; 2) DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION BRIEF; and 3) CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO LIFT STAY. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER to Defendants to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 13, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 24 Motion to Stay (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/15/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/12/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation TO CHANGE TIME OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 14 Motion to Dismiss (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule Regarding Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 29, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/15/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akeena Solar, Inc. et al v. Zep Solar Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akeena Solar, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Arthur Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andalay Solar Inc
Represented By: Neil Arthur Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zep Solar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Resource Option Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Sun Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?