Fu v. Walker Parking Consultants

Plaintiff: Nina Fu
Defendant: Walker Parking Consultants
Case Number: 3:2009cv05056
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ALL PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE; SETTLEMENT Joint Status Conference Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 11/18/2011. Status Conference set for 11/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/3/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
August 18, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 39 Stipulation filed by Walker Parking Consultants Joint Pretrial Statement due by 11/4/2011. Expert Discovery due by 10/21/2011. Expert Witness List due by 9/16/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/18/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
June 6, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND CERTAIN DISCOVERY DEADLINES re 29 Stipulation filed by Walker Parking Consultants. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/6/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
April 13, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS; CONTINUING TRIAL DATES. Accordingly the Court CONTINUES the deadline for hearing dispositive motions and the trial dates. On July 11, 2011, the Court will hear Defendant's Motion for Summary Jud gment. The Court modifies the trial schedule as follows: Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, In Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 9/2/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francis co. Jury Selection set for 10/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2011 - 10/21/2011, 01:00 PM - 04:00 PM; 10/25/2011 - 10/28/2011, 01:00 PM - 04:00 PM; Argue and Submit set for 11/1/2011, 01:00 PM - 04:00 PM; Jury Deliberations set for 11/2/2011 - 11/4/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/13/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
November 18, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 20 filed by Nina Fu vacating the 5/16/2011 trial date and set new trial date and pre-trial deadlines in accordance with the schedule set forth in the parties joint stipulation. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/18/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
September 7, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/7/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fu v. Walker Parking Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Fu
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Parking Consultants
Represented By: Ashley E Choren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?