Arellano et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Arellano and Rachel Arellano
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc., American Brokers Conduit and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05103
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART 25 Motion to Dismiss and REMANDING Case. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING 27 Stipulation to Change Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 30, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/20/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arellano et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Arellano
Represented By: Catherine Rene King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Arellano
Represented By: Catherine Rene King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.
Represented By: Robert Betuel Norum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brokers Conduit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Betuel Norum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?