Guiriba v. Sanofi-Aventis
Plaintiff: J. Aleth Guiriba
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis
Case Number: 3:2009cv05131
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/26/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 37 Stipulation CONTINUING DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING DATE Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/4/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 Stipulation MODIFYING CASE DEADLINES.Expert Witness List due by 11/26/2010. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/1/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER APPROVING 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/12/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RESOLVING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/24/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/22/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guiriba v. Sanofi-Aventis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Aleth Guiriba
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis
Represented By: Lindsey Katherine Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?