Baires et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Dora Baires and Teofilo Miranda
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, The Division of Immigration Health Services, Janet Napolitano, John P. Torres, James T. Hayes, Nancy Alcantar, Jeffrey Sherman, Jose Rodriguez, Timothy Shack, Claudia Mazur, The County of Kern, Kern County Sheriff Department, Kern Medical Center, Lerdo Detention Facility, Donald Youngblood, Khosrow Mostofi, Unknown ICE Officials, Unknown Lerdo Correctional Officers, Unknown Lerdo Medical Staff, Unknown Lerdo Administrators and Unknown Kern Medical Center Staff
Case Number: 3:2009cv05171
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (45 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting 264 STIPULATION Stipulation and Agreement of Compromise and Settlement Order Regarding Plaintiff Teofilo Miranda filed by Brian Myrick, United States of America Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/10/2014. Off ice of Detention and Removal, The Division of Immigration Health Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Department of Homeland Security and Brian Myrick terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 249 Ex Parte Application for Continuance. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re 246 Request for Clarification. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 192 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 210 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 211 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 237 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief filed by The County of Kern, et al.. Set Deadlines as to 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Baires. Sur- Reply due by 12/9/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/20/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 229 Motion to Stay. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 212 STIPULATION Reset Deadlines as to 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Baires Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing filed by Teofilo Miranda, Dora Baires. Responses due by 9/10/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/6/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to 192 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment United States' Amended Notice of Motions and Motions For Judgment On The Pleadings on Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/17/2013 and shall have up to 40 pages. The U S will have up to 20 pages for its reply due after the settlement conference currently scheduled for 6/20/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting 186 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Teofilo Miranda, Dora Baires, 175 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Dora Baires. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 176 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AMENDED Stipulation and [Proposed] Order filed by Dora Baires. Dispositiive Motions due by 8/16/2013. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Franc isco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Selection set for 11/4/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/25/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER CONTINUING THE FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/11/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/14/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER re 126 Stipulation filed by United States of America, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 125 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Responses due by 11/4/2011. Replies due by 11/25/2011. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/19/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER continuing CMC re 120 Stipulation filed by Teofilo Miranda, Dora Baires Further Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/14/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re Third Amended Complaint re 109 Stipulation filed by Teofilo Miranda, Dora Baires. Third Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2011. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/3/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 94 Motion to Dismiss; granting 95 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER to continue hearing re 88 Stipulation, filed by Teofilo Miranda, Dora Baires Amended Pleadings due by 1/21/2011.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/18/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER to allow plaintiffs to file 2nd amended complaint re 78 Stipulation filed by Teofilo Miranda, Dora Baires Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2010.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 61 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER to continue hearing on motion to dismiss re 74 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/24/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER to continue hearing re 71 Stipulation filed by Teofilo Miranda, Dora Baires, Set/Reset Deadlines as to, 61 MOTION to Dismiss ; Individual Federal Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment [ 62 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 59 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 63 Stipulation filed by United States of America, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 63 Stipulation. Responses due by 6/28/2010. Replies due by 7/2/2010. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 41 Motion for Leave to File (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baires et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Baires
Represented By: James M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teofilo Miranda
Represented By: James M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Division of Immigration Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Alcantar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Shack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Mazur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lerdo Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khosrow Mostofi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown ICE Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lerdo Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lerdo Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lerdo Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kern Medical Center Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?