Original Joe's Inc. v. Pinsonneault Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Original Joe's Inc.
Defendant: Pinsonneault Holdings, LLC and Majestic, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv05203
Filed: November 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2010 Filing 34 REPORT on the termination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mcl, COURT STAFF)
February 2, 2010 Filing 33 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE date of 3/2/10 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 31 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Original Joe's Inc.. (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 3/2/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/28/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 27, 2010 Filing 29 STIPULATION re #28 Clerks Notice STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Original Joe's Inc.. (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
December 24, 2009 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 2/10/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The settlement conference set for 1/6/10 at 9:30 AM has been reset for 2/10/10 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 26 STIPULATION re #23 Order Setting Settlement Conference, JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Original Joe's Inc.. (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint byMajestic, LLC, Pinsonneault Holdings, LLC. (Mallet, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #10 Ex Parte Application. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge JOSEPH C. SPERO. Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2009: #1 Cert Serve) (klh, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 23, 2009 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing - Non-evidentiary held on 11/23/2009 before Charles R. Breyer. Case referred to Mag. Judge Spero for settlement. (Date Filed: 11/23/2009). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2009) Modified on 11/24/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2009 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 20, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE by Original Joe's Inc. re #10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Notice of Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC Re Preliminary Injunction. Hearing set for 11/23/09 at 10:00 am. (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Original Joe's Inc. re #10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Proof of Service of Ex Parte Application for TRO and Supporting Documents (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 19 Proposed Order re #10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC re Preliminary Injunction by Original Joe's Inc. (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 18 Declaration of Vijay K. Toke in Support of #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Declaration of Vijay K. Toke ISO Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed byOriginal Joe's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 17 Declaration of Richard Abinader in Support of #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Declaration of Richard Abinader ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed byOriginal Joe's Inc. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 16 Declaration of Rosario "Charo" in Support of #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Declaration of Rosario Tupac ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed byOriginal Joe's Inc. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 15 Declaration of Marie Duggan in Support of #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Declaration of Marie Duggan ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed byOriginal Joe's Inc. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 14 Declaration of John Duggan in Support of #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Declarationof John Duggan ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO and PSC re Preliminary Injunction filed byOriginal Joe's Inc. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 13 Declaration of Charles Pfister in Support of #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Declaration of Charls Pfister ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed byOriginal Joe's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 12 Declaration of Clark Lammers in Support of #10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Declarationof Clark Lammers ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed by Original Joe's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 11 Brief re #10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte Application Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC re Perliminary Injunction filed byOriginal Joe's Inc. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction, Ex Parte Application filed by Original Joe's Inc. (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2009 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Original Joe's Inc. re summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Scheduling Order by Mail (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/17/2009) Modified on 11/18/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2009 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Original Joe's Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Statement, #1 Complaint, #4 ADR Scheduling Order, #5 Summons Issued Proof of Service of Majestic, LLC (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Original Joe's Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Statement, #1 Complaint, #4 ADR Scheduling Order, #5 Summons Issued Proof of Service of Pinsonneault Holdings, LLC (Toke, Vijay) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2009 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Majestic, LLC, Pinsonneault Holdings, LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2009 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2010. Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2010 08:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Original Joe's Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2009 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Original Joe's Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Marie Duggan, Other Affiliate John J. Duggan for Original Joe's Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Majestic, LLC, Pinsonneault Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611038558.) SUMMONS ISSUED. Filed byOriginal Joe's Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2009: #1 Civil cover sheet) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mcl, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Original Joe's Inc. v. Pinsonneault Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinsonneault Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Alan Mallet
Represented By: Kirk B. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majestic, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Alan Mallet
Represented By: Kirk B. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Original Joe's Inc.
Represented By: Guy Orville Kornblum
Represented By: David Michael Zeff
Represented By: Vijay K. Toke
Represented By: Clark Andrew Lammers,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?