LG Home Products, LLC v. Townsend and Townsend and Crew LLP et al
Plaintiff: LG Home Products, LLC
Defendant: Townsend and Townsend and Crew LLP, Steven C. Petersen and David A. Hall
Case Number: 3:2009cv05226
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Request for Dismissal against David A. Hall and Steven C. Petersen. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/13/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Stipulation Extending Mediation Cut Off Date to June 30, 2010. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/27/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/30/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/22/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 10 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/25/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LG Home Products, LLC v. Townsend and Townsend and Crew LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LG Home Products, LLC
Represented By: David Ripley Shaub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Townsend and Townsend and Crew LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?