King v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Shenita M. King
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2009cv05322
Filed: November 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REQUESTING CHAMBERS COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD re 12 Notice (Other) filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/19/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment or remand filed by Shenita M. King. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/13/2010. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISCHARGING OSC; ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE MOTION re 25 Order to Show Cause, ***Deadlines terminated. 25 Order to Show Cause, 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Stipulation and proposed order filed by Shenita M. King. Motions due by 12/6/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/20/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/14/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION re 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Shenita M. King. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/7/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISCHARGING OSC re 19 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/15/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/18/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re 17 Proposed Order filed by Shenita M. King. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION re 15 Stipulation filed by Shenita M. King. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/4/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/12/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenita M. King
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?