Nork et al v. Designed Cookies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deborah Nork, Lee Roberts and Baker's Bouquet
Defendant: Designed Cookies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05336
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (45 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/20/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER to appear telephonically at CMC re 102 Stipulation filed by Designed Cookies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/7/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER continuing ICMC re 97 Stipulation filed by Baker's Bouquet Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/14/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER continuing CMC re 95 Stipulation filed by Designed Cookies, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/16/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER continuing ICMC re 91 Stipulation filed by Baker's Bouquet Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/2/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Continuing CMC re 84 Stipulation filed by Baker's Bouquet, Deborah Nork Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/28/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 72 Stipulation to withdraw motion to compel arbitration filed by Baker's Bouquet. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/28/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER continuing CMC and Deadlines re 70 Stipulation filed by Baker's Bouquet, Deborah Nork Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/10/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 Stipulation, filed by Baker's Bouquet, Deborah Nork, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 68 Stipulation, 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4//15/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO LEE ROBERTS re 63 Stipulation filed by Baker's Bouquet, Lee Roberts, Deborah Nork, Lee Roberts terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/5/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on March 18, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER continuing CMC and ADR deadlines e 55 Stipulation filed by Designed Cookies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/16/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER continuing hearing re 53 Stipulation filed by Designed Cookies, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 53 Stipulation, 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/4/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nork et al v. Designed Cookies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Nork
Represented By: Robert Zarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Roberts
Represented By: Robert Zarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker's Bouquet
Represented By: Robert Zarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designed Cookies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?