Zynga Game Network, Inc. v. Saini et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Defendant: Promila Saini, Sandeep Baweja and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2009cv05373
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Default Judgment (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER continuing cmc to 10/7/10 @ 2:30 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (setting cmc at 2:30) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion re: service and continuing case management conference to 5/7/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
November 13, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Zynga Game Network, Inc., Sandeep Baweja, John Does 1-5 ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611038980.). Filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zynga Game Network, Inc. v. Saini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promila Saini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandeep Baweja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?