Plichta v. Sunpower Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Harry W. Plichta
Defendant: Sunpower Corporation, Thomas H. Werner and Dennis V. Arriola
Case Number: 3:2009cv05473
Filed: November 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER re 278 Letter. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION PLAN (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT) Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Judge Seeborg granting 260 Motion for Attorney Fees (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, PROVIDING FOR NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT HEARING. Final Approval Hearing set for 7/3/2013 03:00 PM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/25/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 235 REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2013 01:30 PM; Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 222 RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying without prejudice 207 Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying without prejudice 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 192 INTERROGATORY LIMITS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 179 REGARDING SCHEDULING. Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/5/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/4/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 144 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Case Management Conference Statement due 1/6/2011. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/22/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE A SINGLE BRIEF OF UP TO 35 PAGES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING RESPONSE DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 108 MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/28/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/19/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER continuing CMC. re (63 in 3:09-cv-05473-CRB) Stipulation filed by Dennis V. Arriola, Thomas H. Werner, SunPower Corporation. Within ten days after the public announcement of the results and completion of SunPower's internal investigation, the parties will meet and confer and propose to the court a new date for the CMC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/22/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 6 Stipulation filed by Dennis V. Arriola, Thomas H. Werner, SunPower Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/22/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plichta v. Sunpower Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry W. Plichta
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunpower Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis V. Arriola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?