Godinho v. Embassy Suites Walnut Creek Remington Hotel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Godinho
Defendant: Embassy Suites Walnut Creek Remington Hotel Corporation, Sunbeam Products, Inc. and Jarden Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv05498
Filed: November 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES, ***Deadlines terminated. 26 Notice (Other) filed by Jarden Corporation, Sunbeam Products, Inc... Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on October 6, 2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/7/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Extending Time for Conducting Mediation and Expert Disclosure re 20 Stipulation filed by Jarden Corporation, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION re 18 Stipulation filed by Michael Godinho. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 Stipulation, filed by Jarden Corporation, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/25/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 5 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Jarden Corporation, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/17/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godinho v. Embassy Suites Walnut Creek Remington Hotel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Godinho
Represented By: Christopher B. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embassy Suites Walnut Creek Remington Hotel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Paul McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarden Corporation
Represented By: Steven Paul McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?