Rea et al v. Peninsula Corridor Joint Powers Board (CALTRAIN) et al
Plaintiff: Cecilia Rea and Dean Rea
Defendant: Peninsula Corridor Joint Powers Board (CALTRAIN) and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv05538
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/26/10. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES *AS MODIFIED* re 47 . Last day to hear Dispositive Motions 9/21/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2010 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2011 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/21/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on June 25, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 43 Stipulation filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Peninsula Corridor Joint Powers Board (CALTRAIN). Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/18/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 24, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 4, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rea et al v. Peninsula Corridor Joint Powers Board (CALTRAIN) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Rea
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Rea
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peninsula Corridor Joint Powers Board (CALTRAIN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Warren Richmond Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?