Sanchez v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: Antonio P. Sanchez
Defendant: Bank of America, Nations First Lending Inc, Alca Corporation, Romeo Felisco Alvidera and Gi Huang Li
Case Number: 3:2009cv05574
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/9/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/26/2010.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/17/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the time for Countrywide to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to 1/21/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio P. Sanchez
Represented By: Sharon Lynn Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations First Lending Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alca Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Felisco Alvidera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gi Huang Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?