Jimenez v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Jimenez
Defendant: Bank of America, Aegis Wholesale Corporation, Commonwealth Land Title, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Twin Capital Mortgage and Darius John Mirshanzaden
Case Number: 3:2009cv05575
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING (1) REQUEST FOR FEES AND (2) MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/20/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 24 Motion for Leave to File (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/16/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/1/2010.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on March 26, 2010. (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 5 Motion to Dismiss; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Jimenez
Represented By: Sharon Lynn Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Capital Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darius John Mirshanzaden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?