Agbabiaka v. HSBC Bank USA National Association et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Agbabiaka
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA National Association, Ownit Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series, 2005-2, Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Litton Loan Servicing LP
Case Number: 3:2009cv05583
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 61 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam Enforcement of Judgment/Sanctions against Phyllis Voisenat filed by Litton Loan Servicing LP, HSBC Bank USA National Association Judgment Debtor Exam set for 12/7/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/12/10. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 55 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/17/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER AWARDING RULE 11 SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/11/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 6 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 19 Motion for Hearing; and GRANTING 23 Motion for Sanctions. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO ALL PARTIES to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 9, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/6/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Pending Motions and Denying Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 1, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-09-3982 JSW. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/9/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agbabiaka v. HSBC Bank USA National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Agbabiaka
Represented By: Phyllis N. Voisenat-Rafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA National Association
Represented By: Ronald David Roup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ownit Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series, 2005-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP
Represented By: Ronald David Roup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?