Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Defense et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Defendant: Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury and Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Case Number: 3:2009cv05640
Filed: December 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2010 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER continuing cmc to 10/26/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Change Time for Further Case Management Conference by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Lynch (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
July 21, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 20 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/16/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 7/21/2010). Case continued to 9/10/10 for further cmc. All defendants except Dept. Of the Defense have produced FOIA documents. A Vaughn Index will be provided.() (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/21/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: SCHEDULING (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Change Time for Filing Dispositive Motions by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: document production and partial dismissal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 14 STIPULATION Regarding Document Production Schedule and Partial Dismissal by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
March 18, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 6/11/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2010 03:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2010 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 13 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/12/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 3/18/2010). Case continued to 7/16/10 @ 3:00 p.m.. for Further Case Management Conference Re: CIA & GlomarCase continued to 7/16/10 @ 9:00 a.m. for Motions as to those defendants who have submitted responses (Motion due 6/11/10, Opposition 6/25/10 Reply 7/2/10) () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2010)
March 8, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 3/8/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 11 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 3/8/10 at 3:00 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 9 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 8 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 8, 2010 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint byCentral Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
January 6, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly L. Herb (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
December 17, 2009 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File documents #1 and #2 by plaintiff's counsels. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2010. Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2010 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 standing orders and cmc order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Electronic Frontier Foundation.(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued); against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611039463.). Filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Jason M. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?