Dalan et al v. Reconstruct Company, Trustee et al
Plaintiff: Sunny Simeon Dalan and Thelma Dalan
Defendant: Reconstruct Company, Trustee, Countrywide Home Loans, Bank of America, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05709
Filed: December 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/12/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/18/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalan et al v. Reconstruct Company, Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reconstruct Company, Trustee
Represented By: Laju Motunrayo Obasaju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Represented By: Laju Motunrayo Obasaju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Laju Motunrayo Obasaju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Laju Motunrayo Obasaju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunny Simeon Dalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Dalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?