Maximum Availability Limited v. Vision Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maximum Availability Limited
Defendant: Vision Solutions, Inc. and William Hammond
Case Number: 3:2009cv05745
Filed: December 7, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 14 Motion to Transfer Case (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER regarding briefing schedule on pending motions re 30 Stipulation filed by William Hammond, Vision Solutions, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 30 Stipulation, 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 18 Ex Parte Application for a Te mporary Restraining Order and an Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a).Amended opposition due by 2/9/2010. Replies due by 2/9/2010. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/5/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 8 Stipulation filed by William Hammond, Vision Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/31/09. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maximum Availability Limited v. Vision Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximum Availability Limited
Represented By: Micah R. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?