Starkey v. F/V Donita LLC et al
Plaintiff: Victor Starkey
Defendant: F/V Donita LLC, Michael E. McCutcheon, Ann Timmer and F/V Donita
Case Number: 3:2009cv05801
Filed: December 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 32 Stipulation filed by F/V Donita. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 to Continue Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by F/V Donita. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting re 23 Stipulation To Stay Discovery Deadlines Until New Trial Date is Set filed by F/V Donita Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 16 Joint Motion to Continue Pretrial and Trial dates (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 14 extending deadline to and including 3/18/2011 to completed percipient discovery; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/3/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 4/26/2010 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/18/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starkey v. F/V Donita LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Starkey
Represented By: Edward M. Bull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Donita LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Timmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Donita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?