Mims v. Group Long Term Disability Plan for Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Mims
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe and Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe
Case Number: 3:2009cv05811
Filed: December 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/15/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER continuing CMC re 43 Stipulation filed by Charlotte Mims Further Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/10/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER continuing briefing scheduke re 41 Stipulation filed by Charlotte Mims, Set/Reset Deadlines 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment. Plaintiff's opening brief due by 4/1/2011. Plaintiff's responses to motion filed 101/4/2010 d ue by 4/1/2011. Defendant's replies due by 4/15/2011. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/20/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER continuing briefing schedule re 37 Stipulation filed by Charlotte Mims, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 37 Stipulation, 32 MOTION for Judgment. Responses due by 1/14/2011. Replies due by 1/28/2011. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/9/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Stipulation filed by Group Long Term Disability Plan for Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe Further Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/20/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mims v. Group Long Term Disability Plan for Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Mims
Represented By: Karen Kay Wind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?