United States of America et al v. Panzo
Petitioner: United States of America and Earl K. Hartsell, Jr.
Respondent: Michael J. Panzo
Case Number: 3:2009cv05945
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re CONTEMPT re 14 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Re: 13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and To Re-Open Case filed by United States of America. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/7/2011 10:00 AM. in Courtroom No. 8, 19th Floor, United States Courthouse, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/12/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by Earl K. Hartsell, Jr., United States of America. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/26/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Panzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earl K. Hartsell, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael J. Panzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?