Sharma et al v. Provident Funding Associates, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Anilech Sharma and Parma Sharma
Defendant: Provident Funding Associates, L.P., Preferred Mortgage, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Max Default Services Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv05968
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE 36 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. The clerk is directed to reassign the case. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING the 10/7/2010 case management conference, re doc 26 Stipulation filed by Anilech Sharma, Parma Sharma. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/6/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2010 is vacated and reset to 8/26/2010 at 3:30 PM, re doc 22 filed by Anilech Sharma, Parma Sharma. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/30/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The case management conference is reset for 7/6/2010 at 11:00 AM, re doc 20 filed by Anilech Sharma, Parma Sharma. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/17/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2010 is vacated and reset to 5/13/2010 at 3:30 PM. re doc 15 filed by Anilech Sharma, Parma Sharma. The parties are directed to file a joint case management statement by no later than 5/6/2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/29/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Preliminary Injunction (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharma et al v. Provident Funding Associates, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anilech Sharma
Represented By: Stephen Conrad Ruehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parma Sharma
Represented By: Stephen Conrad Ruehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Default Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?