Gucci America, Inc. et al v. Huoqing

Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc., Bottega Veneta International, S.A.R.L. and Balenciaga Corporation France
Defendant: Wang Huoqing
Case Number: 3:2009cv05969
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer adopting 47 Report and Recommendation ; granting 28 Motion for Default Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 3, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 28 MOTION for Default Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 1/18/2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 3, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
September 27, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 39 Letter filed by Balenciaga Corporation France, Bottega Veneta International, S.A.R.L., Gucci America, Inc. for STephen M. Gaffigan to appear by phone on 10/1/10 at 1:30 PM. Court will initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/24/10. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gucci America, Inc. et al v. Huoqing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bottega Veneta International, S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balenciaga Corporation France
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wang Huoqing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?