Silgan Containers LLC v. National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA
Plaintiff: Silgan Containers LLC
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 3:2009cv05971
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 220 OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/8/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/21/2015 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/18/2015. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/6/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2015 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2015 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT NATIONAL UNION AND RESOLVING ALL OTHER PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER REGARDING 132 PARTIES MAY 20, 2011 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Beeler on 6/6/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER RE: 97 DENYING MOTION TO DESIGNATE FACTS AS ESTABLISHED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/11. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 88 Stipulation filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/23/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 79 MODIFYING THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER.Further Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 8/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Fran cisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/10/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES RAISED IN JANUARY 11, 2011 JOINT LETTER 76 Letter, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, Silgan Containers LLC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/7/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER MODIFYING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/29/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 67 First MOTION for Discovery submitted by letter pursuant to Judge Beeler's standing order filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, Silgan Containers LLC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/21/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RE: 65 FURTHER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER FURTHER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/29/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/30/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/19/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/10. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE SCHEDULING. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/23/10.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE 20 REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/11/2010. Case Management Conference set for 05/06/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silgan Containers LLC v. National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silgan Containers LLC
Represented By: Loren Kieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?