Slaughter v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Slaughter
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Union Pacific Railroad
Case Number: 3:2009cv05987
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to stipulation, the action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/19/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Ordered that all claims alleged herein be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within sixty days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/1/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/26/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Slaughter
Represented By: Baron J. Drexel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Liza Siu Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Represented By: Liza Siu Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?