King v. Dubois et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Lynell King
Defendant: William H Dubois, California State Bar and Office of Chief Trials Counsel Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2009cv05996
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2011: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2011: # 2 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT: This action is dismissed without prejudice to plaintiff filing an action against his attorney in state court and without prejudice to him filing a federal habeas petition to challenge his conviction. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/17/09 ORDERING that this CASE is TRANSFERRED to Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED.(Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Dubois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lynell King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Dubois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Chief Trials Counsel Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?