Scher v. County of Contra Costa et al
Plaintiff: Danny Scher
Defendant: County of Contra Costa, Catherine Kutsuris and Dennis M. Barry
Case Number: 3:2009cv06034
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/4/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUEST TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING SETTLEMENT APPROVAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/4/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/1/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scher v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Scher
Represented By: Amitai Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Kutsuris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis M. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?