Buesgens v. Hart
Plaintiff: Michael L. Buesgens
Defendant: Beverly Hart
Case Number: 3:2009mc80039
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE TO "REQUEST FOR INFORMATION" (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buesgens v. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Buesgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?