Lawther v. OneWest Bank, FSB et al
Plaintiff: John T. Lawther
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv00054
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment.(jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER FOR JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 14, 2011. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by OneWest Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco be fore Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/7/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER of reassignment. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/26/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 60 TO CONTINUE DATE OF MEDIATION SESSION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/17/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/13/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE: 38 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE: 36 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/18/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawther v. OneWest Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Lawther
Represented By: Stephen Conrad Ruehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?