Allstate Insurance Company v. Barnett et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Richard Barnett and Mario Alexander
Case Number: 3:2010cv00077
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 195 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Mutual Dismissal With Prejudice And [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Motions terminated: 195 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Mutual Dismissal With Prejudice And [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Allstate Insurance Company, 194 Ex Parte Application for Request to Participate in Case Management Conference Via Telephonic Appearance; Proposed Order filed by Richard Barnett.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 183 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Re Contempt 162 176 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND PARTIAL JUDGMENT re 177 Proposed Order filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/23/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER re 165 Plaintiff's Supplemental Witness List. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/23/2011. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/9/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER re 147 Defendant's Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 74 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 82 Defendant's Motion to Stay. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - Further Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/9/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISMISSING MARIO ALEXANDER WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment; and Granting 23 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION HEARING FROM 8/11/10 TO 8/25/10 re 46 Stipulation filed by Richard Barnett. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/5/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF MARIO ALEXANDER TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT re 44 Stipulation filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 5 Stipulation filed by Richard Barnett. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Barnett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Jone Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?