Reynoso v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jose Reynoso
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2010cv00098
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants time to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Net Worth to 7/7/11. Plaintiff's Reply is due 7/21/11. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/5/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/24/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Extending Period to Calculate Interest. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/27/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 COURT TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/10/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynoso v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Reynoso
Represented By: Paul Ham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?