Piper v. American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.
Plaintiff: Penna Piper
Defendant: American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00107
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/23/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/10/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 28 Stipulation Re Case Management Conference Dates: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REJECTING 26 Stipulation Re Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 19 Stipulation TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S.White on 3/26/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piper v. American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penna Piper
Represented By: Steven Mark Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.
Represented By: Amy K Skryja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?