Electrograph Systems, Inc. et al v. Epson Imaging Devices Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Douglas C. Giordan, Electrograph Technologies, Corp. and Electrograph Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology, LTD., Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display Co., Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Meditech USA, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Chi Mei Corporation, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc. and Nexgen Mediatech, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Viewsonic Corporation and Nassau Suffolk Lumber & Supply
Special Master: Martin Quinn
Claimant: State Board of Equalization of the State of California
Intervenor: NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00117
Filed: January 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2014 Filing 353 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/17/2014, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (9267 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 352 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 351 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 349 Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPML Rule 10.4(a) from Philip J. Iovieno, counsel of Electrograph System, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corp.. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 348 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America of Removal from ECF (Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 347 NOTICE by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
July 8, 2013 This action is e-transferred to the transferor Court. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 346 MDL CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER to the transferor Courts. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL panel on 7/8/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 344 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Suggestion of Remand; MDL Dkt. No. 8154 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8040) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order re Revised Pre-Trial Schedule filed by Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Target Corp (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY re #327 , #329 , #330 . (MDL 7842, 7844,7847) Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/14/2013) Modified on 6/17/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2013 Filing 341 CLERKS NOTICE : All motions noticed for argument on Wednesday, June 12, 2013, are taken off calendar and deemed submitted without oral argument. The court will issue an order shortly. This is a docket text entry only, there are no documents associated with this notice( 7842 , 7844 , 7847 , 7850 , 7852 , 7853 , 7854 ) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 340 NOTICE by Viewsonic Corporation re #84 Notice (Other) of Release of Lien by ViewSonic Corporation (Zarian, John) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 339 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation re #327 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants Reply In Support Of Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell (MDL Dkt. 7995) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Gillen, #2 Exhibit A)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 338 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #329 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. B. Douglas Bernheim (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen J. McAhren in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. B. Douglas Bernheim, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)[MDL NO. 7991] (Toto, Martin) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 337 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation re #327 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Reply in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Adam K. Fontecchio and B. Douglas Bernheim Regarding the MPPI (MDL Dkt. 7986) (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2013 Filing 336 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Douglas Bernheim, Ph. D.; Declaration of Roman M. Silberfeld; Dkt. No. 7937 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Exhibit E - H)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 335 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Sharp's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Adam K. Fontecchio and B. Douglas Bernheim Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702; Dkt. No. 7944 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Murray, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 334 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702; Dkt. No. 7929 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Murray, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #332 . (7889) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ORDER RE REVISED PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 332 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Revised Pre-Trial Schedule; MDL Dkt. No. 7889 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 331 Declaration of Jason M. Bussey in Support of 7847 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 7848] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G-H, #3 Exhibit I-L, #4 Exhibit M-R)(Grenfell, John) (Filed on 5/3/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2013 Filing 330 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 7847] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grenfell, John) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 329 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Douglas Bernheim [MDL No. 7844] (Attachments: #1 Declaration f Kristen J. McAhren in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Douglas Bernheim, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Proposed Order)(Toto, Martin) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 328 Declaration of Timothy M. Russo in Support of #327 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Adam K. Fontecchio and B. Douglas Bernheim Regarding the MPPI [MDL Dkt. No. 7843] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Grenfell, John) (Filed on 5/3/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2013 Filing 327 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation Motion In Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Adam K. Fontecchio and B. Douglas Bernheim Regarding the Microprocessor Producer Price Index [MDL Dkt. No. 7842] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grenfell, John) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 23, 2013 Filing 326 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Revised Pre-Trial Schedule; MDL Dkt. No. 7764 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 3, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (TRACK 1B) Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER RE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRACK 1B AND TRACK 2 CASES) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 324 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 323 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013)
March 12, 2013 Filing 322 Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. [MDL Dkt. No.7640] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2013 Filing 321 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 Filing 320 CLERKS NOTICE: Counsel shall file a joint case management conference statement on or before March 8, 2013, for the further case management conference set for hearing on March 15, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 5, 2013 Filing 319 CLERKS NOTICE Status Conference set for 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston in the following cases: 1) Motorola Mobility v. AUO, 09-5840, 2) Electrograph v. AUO, 10-117, Costco v. AUO, 3) 11-58 Best Buy v. AUO, 4) 10-4572, 12-4114Target v. AUO, 5) 10-4945 and 6) Kodak v. AUO, 10-5452. THIS IS A DOCKET TEXT ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013) Modified on 2/5/2013 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #206 , #233 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON. [MDL Dk. No.7420]. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/26/2012) Modified on 12/27/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PURCHASES OF PANELS MADE BY SUPPOSED CONSPIRATORS NOT ALLEGED IN THE COMPLAINTS. [MDL Dk. No. 7419] (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/26/2012) Modified on 12/27/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER DENYING MOTION BY DEFENDANT MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING ELECTROGRAPH PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS 6182 6324 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION AND TOSHIBA'S SEPARATE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING UNDER ILLINOIS BRICK AND IN RE ATM FEE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 313 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #300 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Reply in Support of Defendants' Request for Certification to State Supreme Courts [re MDL Dkt. 7143] (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 312 DECLARATION OF DAVID MARTINEZ ON BEHALF OF DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS AT&T, BEST BUY, TARGET, ET AL., AND ELECTROGRAPH SYSTEMS, INC., ET AL., IN RESPONSE TO CLERK'S NOTICE #307 , (DOCKET NO. 7126) RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET NO. 6350)) Filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 2 and 3, #5 Exhibit 4 and 5, #6 Exhibit 6 and 7)(MDL DOCKET NO.7132)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/13/2012) Modified on 11/14/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2012 Filing 311 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 310 Letter from Jason Murray In Response to Letter from Defendants Seeking Clarification of Order, MDL Dkt No. 7124 . (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 12, 2012 Filing 309 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. (Letter from defendants seeking clarification, MDL Dkt. No. 7135) (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/12/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 308 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. [re MDL Dkt 7053 and 7069] Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants LG Display Co., Ltd.'s and LG Display America, Inc.'s Request for Certification to State Supreme Courts [MDL Dkt 7128] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 307 CLERKS NOTICE re: document filings. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 7, 2012 Filing 306 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. DECLARATION OF PHILIP J. IOVIENO IN SUPPORT OF JOINT PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DAMAGES ARISING FROM PURCHASES OF PANELS MADE BY SUPPOSED CONSPIRATORS NOT ALLEGED IN THE COMPLAINTS (MDL DKT. NO. 6489) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
November 7, 2012 Filing 305 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. Declaration of David Martinez in Response to #302 , 7091 Order for Further Declarations re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 6350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(MDL DKT #7119)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/7/2012) Modified on 11/8/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2012 Filing 304 Declaration of Lee F. Berger In Response to #302 Order For Further Declarations Re: Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment As To Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged In The Complaints filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Ex J, #11 Ex K, #12 Ex L, #13 Ex M, #14 Ex N, #15 Ex O) (MDL DKT #7117)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 11/7/2012) Modified on 11/8/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS. #217 , 6209 . (MDL7109) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/6/2012) Modified on 11/7/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER FOR FURTHER DECLARATIONS RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PURCHASES OF PANELS MADE BY SUPPOSED CONSPIRATORS NOT ALLEGED IN THE COMPLAINTS. The parties shall file the declarations no later than November 7, 2012.(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified on 11/5/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER, Motions terminated: (473 in 3:09-cv-05840-SI) MOTION JOINT REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Motorola, Inc., (7078 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION JOINT REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Motorola, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/31/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 31, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 300 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Amended Request for Leave to File Supplemental Request Under Civil Local Rule 7-3(d) [MDL 7069, 7069-1, 7069-2] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Request for Certification to State Supreme Courts, #2 Proposed Order)(McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 299 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #236 Declaration in Support, Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Evidence Submitted in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under Illinois Brick & ATM Fee (MDL 7054) (House, Holly) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 298 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Request for Leave to File Supplemental Request Under Civil Local Rule 7-3(d) [MDL 7053, 7053-1, 7053-2] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Request for Certification to State Supreme Courts, #2 Proposed Order)(McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 297 Letter from Kevin C. McCann in Response to Court's Order entered on 10-23-12 Regarding Defendants' MSJ on Downstream Pass-On (MDL 7052). (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 295 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 294 RESPONSE to re #277 Reply to Opposition/Response,, PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER ILLINOIS BRICK AND ATM FEE by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS re #194 . 6054 6145 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 10/10/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2012 Filing 292 Special Masters Order Special Master's Order RE Motion of Electrograph to Compel Further Discovery From Mitsui Re 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 10/8/2012)
October 8, 2012 Filing 291 Discovery Letter BriefElectrograph's Post-Hearing Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Further Discovery from Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Nikas, #2 Exhibit A-E, #3 Exhibit F-O)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/8/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (6649) Ex Parte Application for leave to file under seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER signed by Susan Illston on 10/3/12 granting (6867) Ex Parte Application in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Application to shorten time on Motion #'s 6574 and 6575 to 10/12/12 @ 9 a.m. ; granting (167) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-01115-SI; granting (396) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (216) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-05609-SI; granting (465) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting (287) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (82) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-03205-SI; granting (116) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-04346-SI; granting (281) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI; granting (375) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI; granting (99) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 288 Discovery Letter Brief Response to Electrograph's Post-Hearing Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Further Discovery from Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 1, 2012 Filing 287 Ex Parte Application For An Order To Shorten Time For Hearing (filed as docket #6867 in MDL 1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 27, 2012 Filing 286 CLERKS NOTICE : taking off the 9/28/12 calendar the following motions :Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing As To Claims Involving Mobile Phones and Digital Still Cameras, Master Docket Nos. 6054 & 6145; Docket Nos. 276 & 291 in 09-4997; Docket No. 194 in 10-0117; Docket Nos. 175 & 188 in 10-4572; Docket Nos. 229 & 249 in 10-4945; Docket Nos. 66 & 72 in 10-5452; Docket Nos. 165 & 181 in 11-0058. 2.Motion For Partial Summary Judgment on Motorola's Foreign Contract and Unjust Enrichment Claims, Master Docket No. 6322, and Docket No. 413 in 09-5840. The motions are deemed submitted and the Court will issue an order shortly. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDERDENYING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER STRIKING EXPERT REPORTS #265 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 284 Declaration of Ernest E. Vargo in Support of #283 Discovery Letter Brief in Opposition to Electrograph's Second Motion to Compel Further Discovery From Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-Part 1, #7 Exhibit F-Part 2, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #283 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 283 Discovery Letter Brief in Opposition to Electrograph's Second Motion to Compel Further Discovery From Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 21, 2012 Filing 282 REPLY (re #242 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee ) /Toshiba Entities Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under Illinois Brick and In re ATM Fee filed byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Chung, John) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6367 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (330 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (242 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (292 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (305 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 20, 2012 Filing 281 RESPONSE (re #265 MOTION for Discovery - Objection to Special Master's Order Striking Defendants' Expert Reports (public redacted version) (filed in MDL docket on 9/7, spreading to individual dockets) ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Objection to Special Master's Order Striking Defendants' Sur Rebuttal Expert Reports filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert B. McNary, #2 Exhibit A)(Nardacci, Anne) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 20, 2012 Filing 280 CLERKS NOTICE : The following motions are taken off calendar for September 21, 2012, the motions SHALL BE CONTINUED TO FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 28, 2012, AT 9:00 A.M.. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. Defendants' MSJ for Lack of Antitrust Standing as to Claims Involving Mobile Phones and Digital Still Cameras, Master Docket Nos. 6054 & 6145, Dkt. Nos. 276 & 291 in 09-4997; Dkt. No. 194 in 10-0117; Dkt. Nos. 175 & 188 in 10-4582; Dkt. Nos. 229 & 249 in 10-4945; Dkt. Nos. 66 & 72 in 10-5452; and Dkt. Nos. 165 & 181 in 11-0058. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012) Modified on 9/20/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 20, 2012 Filing 279 CLERKS NOTICE : The following motions are taken off calendar for September 21, 2012, the motions SHALL BE CONTINUED TO FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 28, 2012, AT 9:00 A.M.. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. Defendants' MSJ for Lack of Antitrust Standing as to Claims Involving Mobile Phones and Digital Still Cameras, Master Docket Nos. 6054 & 6145 , Dkt. Nos. 276 & 291 in 09-4997; Dkt. No. 194 in 10-0117; Dkt. Nos. 175 & 188 in 10-4582; Dkt. Nos. 229 & 249 in 10-4945; Dkt. Nos. 66 & 72 in 10-5452; and Dkt. Nos. 165 & 181 in 11-0058. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012) Modified on 9/20/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6054 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (6145 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (291 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (276 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (194 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER, (249 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (229 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (72 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (66 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (165 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS, (181 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER denying MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal signed by Judge Illston on 9/17/12 ( 6158 ) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (6353) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; denying (333) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; denying (393) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (414) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; denying (199) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (239) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; denying (189) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (231) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI; denying (299) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (251) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI; denying (182) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (222) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 18, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (237 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (206 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (198 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (228 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (298 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (258 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 18, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (211 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION], (194 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Best Buy's (1) Pre-October 8, 2006 Claims As Time Barred and (2) Post-May 2003 Claims For Failure to Mitigate Damages REDACTED. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #220 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6661 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment on ATS's Claims, (6251 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (6341 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Dell's Damages Claim to Net Overcharges (lodged under seal and served on 7/12/12 as dkt. 6151, filing in public record per Court order, dkt. 6298), (297 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As to Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators REDACTED, (397 in 3:09-cv-05840-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators - REDACTED, (217 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators - REDACTED, (289 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Dell's Damages Claim to Net Overcharges (lodged under seal and served on 7/12/12 as dkt. 259, filing in public record per Court order in MDL 1827 dkt. 6298), (272 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators - REDACTED, (204 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Co-Conspirators - REDACTED, (266 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators - REDACTED, (188 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators - REDACTED. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6379 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DISMISSING BEST BUY'S (1) Pre-October 8, 2006 Claims As Time Barred and (2) Post-May 2003 Claims for Failure to Mitigate Damages, (6182 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION], (6174 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Best Buy's (1) Pre-October 8, 2006 Claims As Time Barred and (2) Post-May 2003 Claims For Failure to Mitigate Damages REDACTED, (6324 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims (lodged under seal and filed 7/17/2012, filing in public record per Court order), (231 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims (lodged under seal and filed 7/17/2012, filing in public record per Court order), (241 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DISMISSING BEST BUY'S (1) PRE-OCTOBER 8, 2006 CLAIMS AS TIME BARRED AND (2) POST-MAY 2003 CLAIMS FOR FAILURE TO MITIGATE DAMAGES. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 277 REPLY (re #235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee ) Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment For Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In re ATM Fee filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael W. Stevens In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment For Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In re ATM Fee, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B thru E)(House, Holly) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER RE: MOTIONS CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 10/3/12 AND 10/5/12 (SETTING NEW SCHEDULE, SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/13/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 275 Declaration of Kevin C. McCann in Support of #274 Reply to Opposition/Response, Supplemental Declaration of Kevin C. McCann in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q, #2 Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit T, #5 Exhibit U, #6 Exhibit V, #7 Exhibit W, #8 Exhibit X, #9 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) #274 ) (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 274 REPLY (re #233 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum ) Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 273 Declaration of Michael E. Mumford in Support of #272 Reply in support filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of deposition of Dr. Michael Moore)(Related document(s) #272 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2012 Filing 272 REPLY (re #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims (lodged under seal and filed 7/17/2012, filing in public record per Court order) ) filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6338 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (6342 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Ilinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (6350 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment as to Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made by Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (6176 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (6234 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (6178 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (331 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Damages Arising from Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (332 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On, (327 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (204 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (233 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (235 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (226 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (196 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (229 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (302 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (256 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (296 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (225 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6326 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities (lodged under seal and served on 7/17/12, filing in public record per Court order), (6383 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (6209 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators, (6151 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Dell's Damages Claim to Net Overcharge, (163 in 3:09-cv-01115-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment on ATS's Claims, (337 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (422 in 3:09-cv-05840-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (243 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPART CO-CONSPIRATORS, (293 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (287 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities (lodged under seal and served on 7/17/12, filing in public record per Court order), (239 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (310 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (233 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Williams Stevens (Stevens, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 270 REPLY in support (re #204 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints ) Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Indirect Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lee F. Berger In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(House, Holly) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6686 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (369) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (267) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI; granting (348) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI; granting (266) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER signed on 9/11/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6670 ) Stipulation continuing motions from 9/14/12 to 9/21/12 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (367) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (266) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (261) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI; granting (346) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI; granting (92) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI; granting (265) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 12, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6145 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (291 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (194 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER, (188 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (249 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (72 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (165 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS, (181 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 11, 2012 Filing 267 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Page Limit for Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 266 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #194 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 265 MOTION for Discovery - Objection to Special Master's Order Striking Defendants' Expert Reports (public redacted version) (filed in MDL docket on 9/7, spreading to individual dockets) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Errata 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11-1, #13 Exhibit 11-2, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Errata 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Errata 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Errata 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Errata 46, #49 Errata 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54, #57 Exhibit 55, #58 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 264 Ex Parte Application to Submit Documents Under Seal in Support of Objection to Special Master's Order Striking Defendants' Expert Reports (filed in MDL docket on 9/7, spreading to individual dockets) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson in support of sealing, #2 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 263 Supplemental Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of LG Display's Reply in Support of #262 Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #262 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 9/7/2012) Modified on 9/10/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2012 Filing 262 REPLY (re #239 MOTION for Summary Judgment LG Display Co., LTD. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal ) LG Display's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 261 RESPONSE (re #235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee ) (lodged under seal and served on 8/20/12, filing in public record per Court order) filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-30, #3 Exhibit 31-57, #4 Exhibit 58-75, #5 Exhibit 76-88, #6 Declaration of Geoff Shavey)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 260 RESPONSE (re #233 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum ) (lodged under seal and served on 8/17/12, filing in public record per Court order) filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER DENYING Motion to File Under Seal (SPREADING TO RELATED Case Nos.: C 09-4997 SI; C 09-1115 SI; C 09-5609 SI; C 10-1064 SI; C 10-0117 SI; C 10-4572 SI; C 10-4945 SI; C 11-0058 SI. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/5/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 258 CLERKS NOTICE The following motions are continued from 9/7/12 to 9/14/12, at 9:00 a.m. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6145 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (6054 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (291 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (276 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (194 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER, (188 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (175 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (249 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (229 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (66 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (72 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (165 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS, (181 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 257 RESPONSE (re #242 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee ) filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit 5-10, #4 Exhibit 11-18, #5 Exhibit 19-23, #6 Exhibit 24-32)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 24, 2012 Filing 256 REPLY (re #194 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER ) filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Salezka L. Aguirre, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (5847 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Dell's Pre-December 2002 Claims as Time Barred and for Partial Summary Judgment of Dell's Failure to Mitigate Damages, (6383 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (6207 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, (6342 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Ilinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (6359 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Toshiba on Liability Issues Determined in the Toshiba Trial, (6326 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities (lodged under seal and served on 7/17/12, filing in public record per Court order), (6324 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims (lodged under seal and filed 7/17/2012, filing in public record per Court order), (5869 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Target Plaintiffs' Claims, (6366 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents, (5875 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing AT&T Mobility LLC's Claims, (6338 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (5979 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment --Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims Based on Indirect Purchases (Costco), (6151 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Dell's Damages Claim to Net Overcharge, (6379 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DISMISSING BEST BUY'S (1) Pre-October 8, 2006 Claims As Time Barred and (2) Post-May 2003 Claims for Failure to Mitigate Damages, (6372 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS, (331 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Damages Arising from Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (332 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On, (334 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS, (330 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (337 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (260 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing AT&T's Claims, (327 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (243 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPART CO-CONSPIRATORS, (242 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (233 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (235 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (204 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (231 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims (lodged under seal and filed 7/17/2012, filing in public record per Court order), (235 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS, (239 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (229 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (241 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DISMISSING BEST BUY'S (1) PRE-OCTOBER 8, 2006 CLAIMS AS TIME BARRED AND (2) POST-MAY 2003 CLAIMS FOR FAILURE TO MITIGATE DAMAGES, (226 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (196 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (302 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (210 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Target Plaintiffs' Claims, (310 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS, (296 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum, (305 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (307 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS, (256 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, (157 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment -Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims Based on Indirect Purchases, (225 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (230 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS, (233 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 20, 2012 Filing 255 RESPONSE (re #220 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee ) filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-30, #3 Exhibit 31-57, #4 Exhibit 58-75, #5 Exhibit 76-88, #6 Declaration of Geoff Shavey)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 Filing 254 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 CLERK NOTICE: Counsel shall file a letter indicating the docket numbers of all the motions filed in the related cases that are continued to 10/5/12. pursuant to the Courts Order granting Stipulation # 6477 by Thursday, August 23, 2012. THIS IS A DOCKET TEXT ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.Set/Reset Deadlines as to (5869 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Target Plaintiffs' Claims, (5875 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing AT&T Mobility LLC's Claims, (6234 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (5979 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment --Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims Based on Indirect Purchases (Costco), (6359 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Toshiba on Liability Issues Determined in the Toshiba Trial, (260 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing AT&T's Claims. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 253 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] ) ELECTROGRAPH SYSTEMS, INC.S AND ELECTROGRAPH TECHNOLOGIES CORP.S OPPOSITION TO MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-19, #3 Exhibit 20-43, #4 Exhibit 44-54, #5 Exhibit 55a, #6 Exhibit 55b, #7 Exhibit 56-76)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 252 RESPONSE (re #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum ) [REDACTED] filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 251 Ex Parte Application re #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum to File Documents Under Seal filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 250 RESPONSE (re #243 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPART CO-CONSPIRATORS ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric J. Weiss, #2 Exhibit 1-6, #3 Exhibit 7-21, #4 Exhibit 22-33, #5 Exhibit 34-35, #6 Exhibit 36 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 36 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 36 Part 3, #9 Exhibit 36 Part 4, #10 Exhibit 36 Part 5, #11 Exhibit 37-42)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 249 RESPONSE (re #237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints ) JOINT PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DAMAGES ARISING FROM PURCHASES OF PANELS MADE BY SUPPOSED CONSPIRATORS NOT ALLEGED IN THE COMPLAINTS filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roman Silberfeld, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order by Hon. Susan Illston granting (6472) Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. Associated Cases: 3:07-md-01827-SI, 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:09-cv-05609-SI, 3:10-cv-00117-SI, 3:10-cv-01064-SI, 3:10-cv-04945-SI, 3:10-cv-05452-SI, 3:11-cv-00058-SI(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 16, 2012 Filing 247 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 246 RESPONSE (re #239 MOTION for Summary Judgment LG Display Co., LTD. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal ) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LG DISPLAY CO., LTD.'S AND LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON WITHDRAWAL filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ROMAN M. SILBERFELD, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 Filing 245 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/3/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 8/9/2012). The Court vacated the November trial date as to Track One.NEW TRIAL SCHEDULE:The track one plaintiffs will be split into two groups for purposes of pretrial and trial dates: Group one: ATS Claim, LLC (09-1115); Nokia (09-5609); Dell, Inc. (10-1064)Group one pretrial date: January 15, 2013Group one trial date: January 22, 2013Group two: Best Buy Co., Inc. (10-4572); Target Corp. (10-4945); and Eastman Kodak Co. (10-5452)Group two pretrial date: June 11, 2013Group two trial date: June 24, 2013Because AT&T has an appeal pending in the 9th Circuit which could ultimately impact the legal contours of its case, the Court will wait for the appeal to be resolved before scheduling a trial.The remaining cases -- Motorola Mobility, Inc. (09-5840) (N.D. Ill.); Electrograph Systems, Inc. (10-0117) (E.D.N.Y.); and Costco (11-0058) (W.D. Wa.) -- were filed out of district and will be transferred back to the originating district so that a court there may establish pretrial/trial dates in accordance with its calendar/procedures. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 244 Declaration of JERRY CHEN in Support of #243 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPART CO-CONSPIRATORS filed byHannstar Display Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71, #72 72, #73 73, #74 74, #75 75)(Related document(s) #243 ) (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 243 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AS TO ALLEGED NONPART CO-CONSPIRATORS filed by Hannstar Display Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 242 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/21/2012. Replies due by 9/28/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #13 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified on 9/21/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2012 Filing 241 Proposed Order re #239 MOTION for Summary Judgment LG Display Co., LTD. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 240 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #239 MOTION for Summary Judgment LG Display Co., LTD. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J)(Related document(s) #239 ) (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 239 MOTION for Summary Judgment LG Display Co., LTD. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 9/7/2012. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 238 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I - Part 1, #10 Exhibit I - Part 2, #11 Exhibit I - Part 3, #12 Exhibit I - Part 4, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) #235 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lee F. Berger In Support of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S, #21 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 236 Declaration of Gregory J. Weingart in Support of #235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #235 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 235 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/20/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 1, 2012 Filing 234 Declaration of Kevin C. McCann in Support of #233 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #233 ) (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 Filing 233 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 232 Declaration of Michael E. Mumford in Support of #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims (lodged under seal and filed 7/17/2012, filing in public record per Court order) filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48)(Related document(s) #231 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims (lodged under seal and filed 7/17/2012, filing in public record per Court order) filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 6139 6142 6150 6162 6171 6172 6175 6180] 6181 6188 6191 6192 6200 6201 6202 6206 6211 6214 6241 6248 6252 6253 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
July 30, 2012 Filing 229 RESPONSE (re #194 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER ) filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren E. Wood, #2 Exhibit A-P)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 228 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER signed on 7/26/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting (6263) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (189) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05609-SI; granting (225) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (277) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-01064-SI; granting (77) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and among the undersigned counsel, on behalf of all Track 1 plaintiffs and defendants, as follows: 1. The Track 1 parties will file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement by July 27, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 Filing 226 NOTICE by Viewsonic Corporation re #84 Notice (Other) Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Bond, Brook) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 24, 2012 Filing 225 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set/Reset Hearings AMENDED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 21, 2012 Filing 224 Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declarartion of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/21/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 223 Proposed Order re #220 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 222 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #220 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibits E to H [Filed Under Seal], #6 Exhibit I - Part 1, #7 Exhibit I - Part 2, #8 Exhibit I - Part 3, #9 Exhibit I - Part 4, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M [Filed Under Seal], #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibits P to V [Filed Under Seal], #17 Exhibit W, #18 Exhibit X [Filed Under Seal], #19 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 221 Declaration of Gregory J. Weingart in Support of #220 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 220 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/20/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 18, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #204 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 219 Ex Parte Application re #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators - REDACTED, #218 Declaration in Support, filed by Hannstar Display Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 218 Declaration of Jerry Chen in Support of #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators - REDACTED filed byHannstar Display Corporation. (Related document(s) #217 ) (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators - REDACTED filed by Hannstar Display Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/16/12., Motions terminated: (148 in 3:09-cv-01115-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, (383 in 3:09-cv-05840-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (198 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, (187 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, (257 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (248 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (290 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, Au Optronics Corporation America, Inc, (71 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (177 in 3:09-cv-05609-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (180 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, ( 6144 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2012 Filing 215 ERRATA re #207 Declaration in Support,, incorrect attachment #1 to Declaration by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 [REDACTED] Exhibits A to O, #2 Exhibit P)(McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 214 Proposed Order re #211 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 213 Declaration of Michael E. Mumford in Support of #211 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-48 [DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL])(Related document(s) #211 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 212 Declaration of Makoto Ichikawa in Support of #211 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Related document(s) #211 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Electrograph Plaintiffs' Claims [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 210 Ex Parte Application To File Documents Under Seal filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 209 Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin C. McCann in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 208 Proposed Order re #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum [REDACTED] Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 207 Declaration of Kevin C. McCann in Support of #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum [REDACTED] Declaration of Kevin C. McCann in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 [REDACTED] Exhibits A to O, #2 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #206 ) (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 205 Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lee F. Berger In Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order [Granting] [Denying] Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Material Under Seal)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 204 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/30/2012. Replies due by 8/6/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lee F. Berger In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-S, Filed Under Seal, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment As To Damages Arising From Purchases of Panels Made By Supposed Conspirators Not Alleged in the Complaints)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 13, 2012 Filing 203 Special Masters Order ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE MATERIAL IN STOWELL REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS (hrg. 7/11/12). (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 Filing 202 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting LG Display Co., Ltd. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 Filing 201 Proposed Order Granting LG Display Co., Ltd. and LG Display America, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 Filing 200 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #199 LG Display Co., LTD. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 [REDACTED] Exhibits A - J)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/13/2012) Modified on 7/16/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2012 Filing 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] LG Display Co., LTD. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 9/7/2012. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 12, 2012 Filing 198 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 197 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 10, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing : TRIAL SET FOR TRACK ONE CASES. Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2012 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 3, 2012 Filing 196 Proposed Order re #194 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER, #195 Declaration in Support,,, #192 Ex Parte Application , #193 Proposed Order, by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 195 Declaration in Support of #194 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER, #193 Proposed Order, #192 Ex Parte Application filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1-6 FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit EXHIBITS 8-10 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11 FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit EXHIBITS 12-13 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 14 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit EXHIBITS 15-28 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 29 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit EXHIBITS 30-36 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) #194 , #193 , #192 ) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 194 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/30/2012. Replies due by 8/24/2012. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 193 Proposed Order re #192 Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 192 Ex Parte Application filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 28, 2012 Filing 191 NOTICE by Nassau Suffolk Lumber & Supply Notice of Lien (White, Alyssa) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 190 Amended Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/18/2012, (amended to reflect proper date on cover page) before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2012. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 26, 2012 Filing 189 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 14, 2012 Filing 187 Special Masters Order Re Electrograph's Motion to Compel Mitsui (Taiwan) to Produce Adequately Prepared 30(b)(6) Witness Deposition Testimony, and for Monetary Sanctions (Hrg. 6/14/12). (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER signed on 6/11/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5868 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #185 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI Extending Deadline for Depositions of Former Electrograph Employees filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 7, 2012 Filing 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Depositions of Former Electrograph Employees filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 22, 2012 Filing 184 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/18/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 5/22/2012). 1) Motion for Interim Reimbursement (#5157) - HELD. 2) Motion for Settlement (#5600) - HELD. 3) Motion to Intervene (#5721) - HELD.All motion are deemed submitted (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 183 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/17/2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 182 CLERKS NOTICE :, LG's Motion for Leave to Amend,#5721 (and all joinders) has been taken off calendar and has been deemed submitted without argument. The Court will issue an order shortly. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (5721 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (5672) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (179) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI Extending Deadline for Depositions of Former Electrograph Employees to 6/11/12, filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5617 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #253 ) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (333) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting ( #173 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting ( #224 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-01064-SI; granting ( #160 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI; granting ( #199 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI; granting ( #56 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI; granting in part and denying in part ( #149 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI.NOW, THEREFORE, Plaintiffs and AUO, through their undersigned liaison counsel and counsel, stipulate as follows: 1. The deadline for the expert report of Dr. Guthrie is extended from April 30, 2012 to May 4, 2012. Dr. Guthries report was served on May 4, 2012. The deadline for the expert reports of Mr. Deal and Dr. Hall is extended from April 30, 2012 to May 7, 2012. 2. The deadlines for the depositions of Mr. Deal, Dr. Guthrie, and Dr. Hall shall be taken 45 days from the service of the reports. 3. Plaintiffs rebuttal expert report, as described in the November 22, 2011 Stipulated Order, is now due on July 9, 2012. The deposition of Plaintiffs rebuttal expert will be taken within twenty-one (21) days of the service of Plaintiffs rebuttal expert report. 4. With regard to the reports and depositions anticipated by Paragraphs 1, 2 and 3, the parties will meet and confer in good faith in an effort to expedite the process, including consideration of whether certain reports or depositions can be eliminated. All parties will cooperate informally in providing information about the underlying data and analyses used in the reports. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 179 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Depositions of Former Electrograph Employees filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 178 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Special Master Quinn's Order Regarding Subpoenas to John Metzler and applEcon LLC by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/11/2012) Modified on 5/14/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 Filing 177 ASSOCIATION of Counsel (MARTHA BOERSCH) by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 176 *NOTICE of Lien by Ralph U. Whipple. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 174 REPLY to #167 Opposition to (re #145 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend ) Reply to Plaintiffs' Oppositions to LG Display america, Inc. and LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 5/8/2012) Modified on 5/9/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2012 Filing 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING AUO EXPERT WITNESSES ** CORRECTION OF DOCKET #172 ** filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 175 *NOTICE of Lien by Lynne C. Whipple. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 172 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING AUO PROPOSED EXPERT WITNESSES filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 171 Joinder JOINDER OF ELECTROGRAPH SYSTEMS, INC. AND ELECTROGRAPH TECHNOLOGIES CORP. IN INDIRECT-PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER RE LG DISPLAYS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS TO APPLECON LLC AND JOHN METZLER by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 2, 2012 Filing 170 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS 5548 (see order for details) re #166 . Signed by Judge Illston on 4/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER signed on 4/30/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting Stipulation re Schedule to Answer or Respond to LG Display's Counterclaims filed by T-Mobile USA Inc(5542) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (242) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (321) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting (166) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (117) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-03517-SI; granting (79) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04346-SI; granting (102) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (138) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI; granting (165) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00711-SI; granting (126) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (115) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02495-SI; granting (124) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (103) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI. See order for specific details (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2012 Filing 167 RESPONSE (re #145 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend ) JOINT OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC. AND LG DISPLAY CO., LTD.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 27, 2012 Filing 166 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 165 Special Masters Order RE LG Display's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas to Applecon LLC and John Metzler (Hrg. 4-6-12). (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston signed on 4/24/12 granting ( 5512 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #163 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI Regarding Deadlines for Electrograph Depositions (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 163 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadlines for Electrograph Depositions filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 9, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #145 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend. Responses due by 4/27/2012. Replies due by 5/8/2012. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (5419) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned DAPs, AGs, and LG Display, by and through their undersigned liaison counsel and subject to the concurrence of the Court, as follows:(1) The time for the undersigned DAPs and AGs served with LG Displays Motion to Amend to file their Oppositions to LG Displays Motion shall be extended to and including April 27, 2012. The DAPs shall file a single opposition brief to LG Displays Motion to Amend.(2) LG Displays time to file its Reply(ies) in support of its Motion shall be extended to and including May 8, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 161 RESPONSE to re #141 Notice (Other), Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Regarding Trial Structure and Duplicative Recovery by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 160 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #149 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Further Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #149 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 159 REPLY (re #149 MOTION to Compel ) Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 4/2/12 granting ( 5345 ) Stipulation to dismiss Samsung in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #152 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 2, 2012 Filing 157 NOTICE by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp. DESCRIPTION OF ISSUES/SUBJECTS OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 Filing 156 RESPONSE (re #152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ) ViewSonic Corporations Objection to Stipulation of Dismissal filed byViewsonic Corporation. (Zarian, John) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 Filing 155 NOTICE by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. Defendants' Descriptions of Summary Judgment Motions (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA FELDER (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 153 Brief re #148 MOTION to Compel ELECTROGRAPHS BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO LG DISPLAYS MOTION TO COMPEL filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Related document(s) #148 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 151 REDACTION to #150 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #149 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Exhibit E - F, #3 Exhibit G - H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J - K, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Exhibit M, #8 Exhibit N - Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 150 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #147 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Exhibit A to Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #148 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 149 REDACTION to #148 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 148 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #147 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( #99 in 3:11-cv-04119-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #146 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #90 in 3:10-cv-05625-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co. Ltd., ( #111 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( 5304 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #68 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #124 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #88 in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd... Signed by Judge Illston on 3/27/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 23, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #145 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 Filing 146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 145 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Proposed Order)(Unger, Sean) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 5174 Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting #142 Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI Extending time to move to compel certain discovery (ELECTROGRAPH) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 3/15/12 granting 5055 Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting #140 Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI extending time to move to compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO MOVE TO COMPEL AS TO CERTAIN DISCOVERY filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 141 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and Of Issue and Claim Preclusion (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 7, 2012 Filing 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO MOVE TO COMPEL AS TO CERTAIN DISCOVERY filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 139 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting (5019) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (137) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI signed by Judge Illston on 3/2/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 1, 2012 Filing 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadlines for Depositions and Summary Judgment Topic Disclosures filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting (4882) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (134) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI signed by Judge Illston on 2/27/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting (4881) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (133) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI signed by Judge Illston on 2/27/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 27, 2012 Filing 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Move to Compel as to Certain Discovery filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 27, 2012 Filing 133 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS SHARP CORPORATION AND SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATIONS DEADLINE TO MOVE TO COMPEL filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #130 Stipulation signed by Judge Illston on 2/16/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 15, 2012 Filing 131 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
February 14, 2012 Filing 130 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 129 *NOTICE of Lien by Douglas C. Giordan. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DENYING MITSUI TAIWAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ELECTROGRAPH) re #110 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/1/2012) Modified on 2/2/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2012 Filing 127 REPLY (re #110 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint ) filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 126 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #125 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - ELECTROGRAPH SYSTEMS, INC.S AND ELECTROGRAPH TECHNOLOGIES CORP.S OPPOSITION TO #110 MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Nikas, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15-20, #7 Exhibit 21-29)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/6/2012) Modified on 1/9/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #123 Administrative Motion to file under seal (with Judge's signature #4462) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2011 Filing 124 RESPONSE (re #110 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint ) ELECTROGRAPH SYSTEMS, INC.S AND ELECTROGRAPH TECHNOLOGIES CORP.S OPPOSITION TO MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (REDACTED) filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Nikas, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2-29)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/30/2011)
December 30, 2011 Filing 123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ELECTROGRAPH SYSTEMS, INC.S AND ELECTROGRAPH TECHNOLOGIES CORP.S OPPOSITION TO MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Nikas, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/30/2011)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Re: Extension of time to respond to Contention Discovery Requests (#4400) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 Filing 121 Special Masters Order Granting Leave to Sharp Corporation and Sharp Electronics Corporation to Supplement Defendants' Identification of Expert Witnesses. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplement By Sharp Corporation and Sharp Electronics Corporation to Defendants' Identification of Expert Witnesses for Purposes of Track 1 Direct Action Cases)(Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 120 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Re: Fact Discovery re #113 . (#4289) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER exending briefing schedule to motion to dismiss re #115 . (#4303)(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER PERMITTING 30(B)(6) DEPOS. BEYOND CUTOFF (#4312) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING TIME TO RESPOND TO CONTENTION DISCOVERY REQUESTS (#4313) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 8, 2011 Filing 115 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.S MOTION TO DISMISS ELECTROGRAPH SYSTEMS, INC.S AND ELECTROGRAPH TECHNOLOGIES CORP.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 114 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 6, 2011 Filing 113 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 112 Request for Judicial Notice re #110 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint, #111 Declaration in Support, filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #110 , #111 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 111 Declaration of Michael E. Mumford in Support of #110 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DRAM Complaint)(Related document(s) #110 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/15/2011. Replies due by 12/22/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Makoto Ichikawa, #2 Proposed Order)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER permitting 30(b)6) depos beyond cutoff re #108 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2011 Filing 108 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. BEYOND DISCOVERY CUTOFF DATE by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Re: AUO Depositions (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Re: AUO Proposed Expert Witnesses(#4166) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER TO MODIFY NOVEMBER 13, 2009 ORDER RE DEPONENTS ASSERTING THE FIFTH AMENDMENT PRIVILEGE AGAINST SELF-INCRIMINATION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AS TO THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS AND THEIR STATUS AS "BUSINESS RECORDS" (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 103 STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY AS TO THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS AND THEIR STATUS AS "BUSINESS RECORDS" by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 102 NOTICE by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. / Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Lazerwitz, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER REGARDING ANSWERS TO ELECTROGRAPH'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 100 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ANSWERS TO ELECTROGRAPH'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER re #98 Stipulation. (10-0117) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2011 Filing 98 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. to Respond to the First Amended Complaint and [Proposed] Order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. McCann (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (#3678) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 95 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #94 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/29/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (10-117) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 93 AMENDED COMPLAINT [REDACTED] against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc., Nexgen Meditech USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology, LTD., Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. Filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 92 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 91 CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the Court is no longer accepting new motions to be noticed for Friday, November 4, 2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 90 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2011 before Illston (Date Filed: 8/30/2011) re (70 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI, 70 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., (2892 in 3:07-md-01827-SI, 2892 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited. (Court Reporter D. Pas.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MITSUI TAIWAN'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND FOR DISMISSAL re #70 . An amended complaint is due 9/23/11. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) Modified on 8/30/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re: extension to time to respond to complaint in 11-3856 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
July 29, 2011 Filing 87 Request for Judicial Notice re #85 Reply in support of Mitsui Taiwan's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Dismissal filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #85 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2011 Filing 86 Declaration of Michael E. Mumford in Support of #85 Reply in support of Mitsui Taiwan's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Dismissal filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cited portions of MetroPCS 2010 Proxy Statement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cited portions of MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 1 of 6), #3 Exhibit 2 - Cited portions of MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 2 of 6), #4 Exhibit 2 - Cited portions of MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 3 of 6), #5 Exhibit 2 - Cited portions of MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 4 of 6), #6 Exhibit 2 - Cited portions of MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 5 of 6), #7 Exhibit 2 - Cited portions of MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 6 of 6))(Related document(s) #85 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2011 Filing 85 REPLY (re #70 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE by Viewsonic Corporation Notice of Lien (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Abstract of Judgment)(Bond, Brook) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2012 03:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 82 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #81 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Electrograph's Opposition to Mitsui Taiwan's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) and for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno in Support of Electrograph's Opposition to Mitsui Taiwan's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal Document #3056 (C-11-0117) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 80 Request for Judicial Notice re #79 Declaration in Support, #78 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Related document(s) #79 , #78 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 79 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno in Support of #78 Opposition/Response to Motion, (REDACTED) filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 78 RESPONSE (re #70 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Electrograph's Opposition to Mitsui Taiwan's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) and for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 77 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno in Support of Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 30, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (70 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (2892 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER CONTINUING MOTIONS (2892)COUNSEL IS REMINDED TO REFERENCE DOCUMENT NUMBERS FOR ALL MOTIONS THAT ARE BEING CONTINUED IN BOTH CASES (NOT JUST CITE THE ONE DOCUMENT IN THE MDL CASE) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (70 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (2892 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Replies due by 7/15/2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 74 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order continuing hearing date to August 26, 2011 for Mitsui Taiwan's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Dismissal by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 73 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re (2915): Dismissing with prejudice as against defendants Chi Mei Corporation, Chimei Innolux Corporation (f/k/a Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corp.), CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc., and Nexgen Mediatech USA. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011) Modified on 6/20/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 Filing 71 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui & Co., Ltd. for Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. , Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd.'s Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Makoto Ichikawa, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Mitsui Taiwan's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Dismissal)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Tracy Cole, and Michael E. Mumford (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 31, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #57 Transcript, #62 Transcript. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2011) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
May 11, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (42 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support ThereofJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Thereof, (2648 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) re Court's March 16, 2011 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Dell Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points & AuJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) re Court's March 16, 2011 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Dell Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points & AuJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) re Court's March 16, 2011 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Dell Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Au, (2649 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) re Court's March 28, 2011 Order Denying Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Motorola Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support ThereoJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) re Court's March 28, 2011 Order Denying Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Motorola Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support ThereoJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) re Court's March 28, 2011 Order Denying Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Motorola Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Thereo. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
April 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF ELECTROGRAPH'S MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT re #42 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Re: STIPULATION of Dismissal by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp re #65 . Dismissing Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. with prejduice.(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re: Dismissal by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Dismissing defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. ("CPT") and Tatung Company of America, Inc. ("Tatung America") with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011) Modified on 3/10/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE by State Board of Equalization of the State of California re #39 Notice (Other) Release of Lien (Baker, Victoria) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 62 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 4, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Chrisopher V. Fenlon ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056317.) filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 receipt, #2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Anne M. Nardacci ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056318.) filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 receipt, #2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 57 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on February 4, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/15/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 55 Letter from Philip J. Iovieno requesting continuance of January 28, 2011 hearing CORRECTION OF DOCKET #54 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Hearing Date)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 54 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #55 . *** Letter from Philip J. Iovieno requesting continuance of January 28, 2011 hearing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Hearing Date)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/24/2011) Modified on 1/24/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Ex Parte Application to seal. COUNSEL IS REMINDED THAT IF A MOTION APPLIES TO C-07-1827 AND C-10-0117 (or any other civil case) BOTH CASE NUMBERS MUST BE ON THE CAPTION SO THAT THE DOCKETING OF THE ORDER IS CORRECT. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 52 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint [REDUCTED VERSION] filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2011 Filing 51 Proposed Order re #49 Ex Parte Application To File Documents Under Seal by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 50 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno in Support of #49 Ex Parte Application To File Documents Under Seal filed byElectrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Related document(s) #49 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 49 Ex Parte Application To File Documents Under Seal filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 11, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #38 Transcript, #37 Transcript, #36 Transcript, #13 Transcript. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting (2289) Motion to Shorten Time in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (41) Motion to Shorten Time in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 47 Request for Judicial Notice re #45 Memorandum in Opposition filed byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 46 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of #45 Memorandum in Opposition filed byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-D, #3 Exhibit E-H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J-S)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend filed byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 44 Proposed Order re #41 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Intervene, #42 MOTION to Intervene in Order to Oppose Motion for Leave to Amend by NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 43 Declaration in Support of #41 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Intervene, #42 MOTION to Intervene in Order to Oppose Motion for Leave to Amend filed byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #41 , #42 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION to Intervene in Order to Oppose Motion for Leave to Amend filed by NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Intervene filed by NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 13, 2010 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Tatung Company of America, Inc.. (Ahern, Patrick) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE by State Board of Equalization of the State of California of Tax Lien (Baker, Victoria) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 38 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-22-2010, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2010. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 37 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/10/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 36 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 14, 2010, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint of Electrograph Systems Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corp. bySanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change in MDL Master Case Number Format (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Nick S. Verwolf ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611045880.) filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 receipt, #2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER APPOINTING MARTIN QUINN AS SPECIAL MASTER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 30 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc., Nexgen Meditech USA, Inc.. (Pearson, Gordon) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Dibley, Allison) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 28 Hannstar Display Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint of Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation byHannstar Display Corporation. (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 27 Defendant Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies, Corp. bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 26 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint of Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies, Corp. byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc., Nexgen Meditech USA, Inc.. (Pearson, Gordon) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint of Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint / Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Electrograph Systems, Inc.'s and Electrograph Technologies, Corp.'s Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Cross, Wayne) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint / Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s Answer to Electrograph Systems, Inc.'s and Electrograph Technologies, Corp.'s Complaint byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.. (Cross, Wayne) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint / Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Electrograph Systems, Inc.'s and Electrograph Technologies, Corp.'s Complaint byToshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Cross, Wayne) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint / Toshiba Corporation's Answer to Electrograph Systems, Inc.'s and Electrograph Technologies, Corp.'s Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (Cross, Wayne) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint of Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies, Corp. byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Lazerwitz, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint of Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies, Corp. byLG Display America, Inc.. (Lazerwitz, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint of Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies, Corp. bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint of Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies, Corp. bySharp Corporation. (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 16 Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp. byEpson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER extending deadline to file response to complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by AU Optronics Corporation America, AU Optronics Corporation. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 10, 2010 Filing 13 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 5, 2010, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 2, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Philip J. Iovieno ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611041884.) filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 receipt, #2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of William A. Isaacson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611041884.) filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 receipt, #2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 11, 2010 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE re Instrcstions to parties. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:09-cv-04845. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 11, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 28, 2009 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) directing the transfer of this action under Title 28, United States Code, Section 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of 4/17/07, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Hon. Susan Yvonne Illston. Ordered by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 12/7/09, stay lifted 12/22/09. Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Mahon, Cinthia)
December 28, 2009 Filing 5 Letter from Rufino Santos, Deputy Clerk, USDC, NDCA, to Clerk, EDNY, dated 12/24/09 re: enclosing a cert. copy of the order from the JPMDL transferring this action to the NDCA, San Francisco Division. The case has been assigned to the Hon. Susan Illston for coordinated or consolidated pretrial processing pursuant to 28:1407. (Mahon, Cinthia)
December 22, 2009 Filing 4 Email from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, to Clerk, EDNY dated 12/22/09 re: attached are two pdf documents related to the filing of a Conditional Transfer Order in MDL No. 1827 - In Re: TFT-LCD (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litigation. INFORMATION ONLY (Attachments: #(1) Letter from JPMDL to Clerk, EDNY, #(2) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-6)) (Mahon, Cinthia)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle. See order for further instructions. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) or Plaintiff pro se is obligated to serve a copy of this order on each defendant.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 11/12/2009. (Lundy, Lisa)
November 12, 2009 Case Ineligible for Arbitration (Bollbach, Jean)
November 6, 2009 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Major, Jasmine).
November 6, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Receipt No. 4653007462) against AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, LTD., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc., Nexgen Meditech USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology, LTD. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Major, Jasmine)
November 6, 2009 Summons Issued as to AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, LTD., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc., Nexgen Meditech USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology, LTD.. (Major, Jasmine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrograph Systems, Inc. et al v. Epson Imaging Devices Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Viewsonic Corporation
Represented By: John N. Zarian
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Nassau Suffolk Lumber & Supply
Represented By: Alyssa White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Martin Quinn
Represented By: Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Gordon Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan CO., LTD
Represented By: Gordon Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Martin M Toto
Represented By: Wayne A. Cross
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Patrick J. Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Martha A Boersch
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Allison Marie Dibley, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Michael Williams Stevens
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Michael Robert Lazerwitz
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Michael Williams Stevens
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Michael Robert Lazerwitz
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Meditech USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Martin M Toto
Represented By: Wayne A. Cross
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Martin M Toto
Represented By: Wayne A. Cross
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Timothy C. Hester
Represented By: Robert D. Wick,
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Represented By: Daniel M Suleiman
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Timothy C. Hester
Represented By: Robert D. Wick,
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Represented By: Daniel M Suleiman
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Timothy C. Hester
Represented By: Robert D. Wick,
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Represented By: Daniel M Suleiman
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HannStar Display Corporation
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Martha A Boersch
Represented By: Allison Marie Dibley, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Represented By: Nick S. Verwolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Corporation
Represented By: Gordon Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,
Represented By: Martin M Toto
Represented By: Wayne A. Cross
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas C. Giordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrograph Technologies, Corp.
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Melissa B Felder,
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Anne M. Nardacci
Represented By: Christopher V. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrograph Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Melissa B Felder,
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Anne M. Nardacci
Represented By: Christopher V. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: State Board of Equalization of the State of California
Represented By: Victoria Christine Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?