Sutcliffe et al v. GMAC Mortgage
Plaintiff: Russell Sutcliffe and Connie Sutcliffe
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2010cv00138
Filed: January 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Connie Sutcliffe, Russell Sutcliffe. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/17/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF STEVEN LEZELL re 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461104421.) filed by Connie Sutcliffe, Russell Sutcliffe, 28 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/6/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 22 Stipulation, filed by Connie Sutcliffe, Russell Sutcliffe. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/31/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutcliffe et al v. GMAC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Sutcliffe
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Sutcliffe
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?