Luce et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Luce, Jean Luce and FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump business
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc. and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00174
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RELATED CASE ORDER. Luce v. A.W. Chesterton Co., 10-0174 MMC, is related to Luce v. A.W. Chesterton Co., 10-2111 WHA. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND; VACATING MARCH 19, 2010 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 16, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION'S APPLICATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. No later than February 12, 2010, opposition to the application for a stay of proceedings, if any, shall be filed. No later than February 19, 2010 , any reply shall be filed. As of February 19, 2010 or the date on which a reply is filed, whichever is earlier, the Court will take the application under submission. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luce et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Luce
Represented By: Daniel Lee Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Luce
Represented By: Daniel Lee Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump business
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Cari Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?