Mattingly v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Amdrew Mattingly
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department, San Francisco Sheriff Department, Milen S. Brewster and Tam
Case Number: 3:2010cv00193
Filed: January 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MEDICAL EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/5/12. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 136 ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR ORDER ALLOWING SURGICAL METAL PLATE THROUGH SECURITY filed by Andrew Mattingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/27/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REFRESHMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/24/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER RE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/10/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Order granting 127 ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR ORDER ALLOWING HANDCUFFS AND EQUIPMENT THROUGH SECURITY Order filed by Andrew Mattingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/8/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REFERRING FOR SETTLMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/19/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 2/27/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magist rate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2012 to March 6, 2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/24/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to complete Cameron deposition to 06/24/11. Signed by Mag. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 06/14/2011. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 Stipulation filed by Tam, Milen S. Banegas, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/6/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 70 Proposed Order filed by Andrew Mattingly. Signed by Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/19/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER VACATING HEARINGS BEFORE HON. JAMES LARSON.. Signed by Magistrate Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/2/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE FILING DATE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RE 4/22/2011 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, doc re 32 filed by Andrew Mattingly. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Settlement Conference briefs 2011 may be submitted by 4/14/2011 rather than by 4/12/2011 as previously ordered. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/29/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Stipulation, filed by Tam, Milen S. Banegas, City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/28/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 8 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Milen S. Brewster, Tam, San Francisco Sheriff Department, City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/9/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattingly v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amdrew Mattingly
Represented By: David M. Helbraun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milen S. Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?