Smith et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Robert Smith and Jodi Smith
Defendant: Timothy Munsil, United States of America and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2010cv00212
Filed: January 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (5/7/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (4/30/2012). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT OFF re 49 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 10, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO INCREASE AMOUNT OF CLAIM by Judge William Alsup [granting 42 Motion to Amend/Correct]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 14, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 30 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Munsil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa K. B. Sladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Represented By: Patricia Ann Turnage
Represented By: Guy Allison Odom, Jr.
Represented By: Glenn Lee Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Smith
Represented By: Guy Allison Odom, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?