Jones v. Rash Curtis & Associates

Plaintiff: Michele Jones
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Case Number: 3:2010cv00225
Filed: January 15, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 31 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 2, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
June 25, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/25/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 16, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/16/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
May 17, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/17/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
April 20, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/20/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Rash Curtis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Jones
Represented By: Ryan Scott Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?