Miller v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Daniel M. Miller
Defendant: Facebook, Inc. and Yao Wei Yeo
Case Number: 3:2010cv00264
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1125a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2011 158 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CLOSING CASE re 157 Stipulation filed by Yao Wei Yeo. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 157 STIPULATION Stipulation of Dismissal by Yao Wei Yeo. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 156 NOTICE REGARDING PURPORTED SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 155 NOTICE REGARDING ATTENDANCE AT JUNE 9 HEARING re 154 Affidavit filed by Facebook, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 154 AFFIDAVIT re 153 Order Declarations of Colin Stretch and Craig Clark in Response to Court's Notice re June 9, 2011 Hearing by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 31, 2011 153 NOTICE RE JUNE 9 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 31, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 26, 2011 152 REPLY (re 141 MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byYao Wei Yeo. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 151 REPLY (re 136 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Yao Wei Yeo ) filed byDaniel M. Miller. (Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 19, 2011 150 DECLARATION of Andrew P. Holland in Opposition to 147 Opposition/Response to Motion for Entry of Default filed byYao Wei Yeo. (Related document(s) 147 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 149 DECLARATION of Yao Wei Yeo in Opposition to 147 Opposition/Response to Motion for Entry of Default filed byYao Wei Yeo. (Related document(s) 147 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 148 Request for Judicial Notice re 147 Opposition/Response to Motion for Entry of Default filed byYao Wei Yeo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 147 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 147 RESPONSE (re 136 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Yao Wei Yeo ) filed byYao Wei Yeo. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 146 RESPONSE (re 141 MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byDaniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 6, 2011 145 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/27/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 144 Declaration of Yao Wei Yeo in Support of 141 Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Yao Wei Yeo. (Gerrish, Stephen) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2011 143 Declaration of Andrew P. Holland in Support of 141 Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Yao Wei Yeo. (Gerrish, Stephen) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2011 142 Request for Judicial Notice re 116 Declaration in Support,, in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment filed byYao Wei Yeo. (Related document(s) 116 ) (Gerrish, Stephen) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 141 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Yao Wei Yeo. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Gerrish, Stephen) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 140 Featured Case ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST AND CONTINUING HEARING re 138 Stipulation filed by Yao Wei Yeo. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 4, 2011 139 Declaration of Andrew P. Holland in Support of 138 Stipulation for Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion to Set Aside Default filed byYao Wei Yeo. (Related document(s) 138 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 138 STIPULATION and Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion to Set Aside Default by Yao Wei Yeo. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 12, 2011 137 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/13/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 12, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) Modified on 4/12/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2011 136 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Yao Wei Yeo filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Yao Wei Yeo, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Bradley Green, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Kajikami, # 4 Exhibit 1 (Second Amended Complaint), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Proof of Service), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Entry of Default), # 7 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, # 8 Proposed Order Proposed Order Pursuant to Entry of Default Judgment)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 12, 2011 135 REMINDER NOTICE RE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 12, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 18, 2011 134 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY DISMISSING CASE re 133 Stipulation filed by Facebook, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 17, 2011 133 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(A)(1) by Facebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 11, 2011 132 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting 113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 10, 2011 131 Declaration of Morvarid Metanat in Support of 113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 113 ) (Metanat, Morvarid) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 8, 2011 130 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 128 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit B to Krista Holt Delcaration by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 8, 2011 129 Declaration of Krista Holt in Support of 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE FIRST COUNTERCLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT (REDACTED) per Order - Docket No. 128 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 120 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 7, 2011 128 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 127 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/27/10, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2011. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 4, 2011 126 EXHIBITS re 116 Declaration in Support,, of David Crane filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected 3, # 2 Exhibit Corrected 4, # 3 Exhibit Corrected 5, # 4 Exhibit Corrected 6, # 5 Exhibit Corrected 7, # 6 Exhibit Corrected 8, # 7 Exhibit Corrected 9, # 8 Exhibit Corrected 12, # 9 Exhibit Corrected 15)(Related document(s) 116 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 125 CLERKS NOTICE of Manual Filing re 116 Declaration of David Crane; One CD titled Declaration of David Crane In Support of Facebook Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment re Contributory Copyright Infringement, Exhibit 17. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE FIRST COUNTERCLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 124 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 116 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Crane. (Metanat, Morvarid) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 3, 2011 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Metanat, Morvarid) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 121 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE FIRST COUNTERCLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 120 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE FIRST COUNTERCLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/4/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2011 119 Declaration of Julie Tung in Support of 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 114 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 118 Declaration of Allison Grabler in Support of 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 114 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 117 Declaration of Randolph Moon in Support of 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 114 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 116 *** REFER TO DOCUMENT 126 FOR CORRECT EXHIBITS. *** Declaration of David Crane in Support of 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 114 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/4/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2011 115 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C1, # 4 Exhibit C2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 114 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment RE CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/4/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2011 113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Sealing Order Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Sealing Order)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel M. Miller. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H.1, # 10 Exhibit H.2, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/4/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2011 111 STIPULATION OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Facebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 14, 2011 110 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 108 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 109 Proposed Order re 108 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056205.) by Daniel M. Miller. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 108 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Timothy C. Davis ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056205), filed by Daniel M. Miller. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 19, 2011 107 Featured Case ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL re 106 Stipulation filed by Facebook, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 106 STIPULATION re 102 Letter Brief regarding Motion to Compel by Facebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 105 Letter from Julio C. Avalos in Response to Plaintiff's Letter of January 14, 2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 14, 2011 104 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 103 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings]. Defendant's response due by noon on 1/18/2011. Discovery Hearing set for 1/19/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/14/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 103 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 104 *** ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 102 Letter filed by Daniel M. Miller]. Defendant's response due by noon on 1/18/2011. Discovery Hearing set for 1/19/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/14/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2011 102 Letter from Brian D. Hancock, Counsel for the Plaintiff to Judge Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 12, 2011 101 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO CHANGE TIME by Judge Alsup denying 100 Motion Enlarge Time (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 11, 2011 100 MOTION To Enlarge Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3 filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Enlarge Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Enlarge Time)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 3, 2011 99 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CHANGE TIME re 97 Stipulation filed by Facebook, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 2, 2011 98 Featured Case FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2011. All other dates remain the same. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/2/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2011)
December 30, 2010 97 STIPULATION FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-2 by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 23, 2010 96 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. Case C10-0264 is related to C10-80301 VRW MISC. The more recently filed case shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/20/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
November 30, 2010 95 Featured Case ORDER CANCELLING DISCOVERY HEARING SET FOR 12/1/2010 AT 11:00 AM AND MEET-AND-CONFER FROM 8:00--11:00 AM [re 88 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/30/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 94 MOTION for Administrative Relief filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 29, 2010 93 RESPONSE to re 86 Letter by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 23, 2010 92 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Alsup entered 85 Motion for Protective Order (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 91 Featured Case ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Alsup entered 85 Motion for Protective Order (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (whalc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/23/2010 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2010 90 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 89 Statement of Non-Opposition filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 89 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 89 Statement of Non-Opposition re 85 MOTION for Protective Order filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 85 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 88 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 86 Letter filed by Daniel M. Miller]. Discovery Hearing set for 12/1/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Defendant's response due noon 11/29/2010. Meet and confer starting from 11:00 AM AND ENDING 2:00 PM in Attorney's Lounge, 18th floor, federal courthouse. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/22/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 22, 2010 87 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION RE PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 22, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 19, 2010 86 Letter from Brian D. Hancock on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 19, 2010 85 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Protective Order, # 2 Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
September 28, 2010 84 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-16-10, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2010. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 23, 2010 83 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 84 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-16-10, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/28/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 82 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Yao Wei Yeo. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 81 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Yao Wei Yeo filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian D. Hancock Supporting Entry of Default Against Defendant Yao Wei Yeo)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 21, 2010 80 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup denying 70 Motion to Dismiss; granting 77 Motion to Supplement Record (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 16, 2010 79 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/16/2010) re 70 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/16/2010)
September 13, 2010 78 Memorandum in Opposition re 77 MOTION for Administrative Relief, Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11, To Allow Supplementation of the Record Pertaining to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(B), F.R.C.P. filed by Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 77 MOTION for Administrative Relief, Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11, To Allow Supplementation of the Record Pertaining to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(B), F.R.C.P. filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit (MSA Second Page), # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 2, 2010 76 Declaration of Craig Clark in Support of 74 Reply Memorandum re Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 75 Declaration of Julio Avalos in Support of 74 Reply Memorandum re Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 74 Reply Memorandum re 70 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) filed by Facebook, Inc. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 9/2/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2010 73 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM byDaniel M. Miller. (Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 26, 2010 72 Memorandum in Opposition re 70 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Response In Opposition to Defendant Facebook, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(B), Fed.R.Civ.P., # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock Supplementing Proof of Service of Second Amended Complaint on Defendant Yao Wei Yeo, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian D. Hancock, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Brian D. Hancock, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Brian D. Hancock, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas L. Bridges, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Douglas L. Bridges, # 8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Douglas L. Bridges, # 9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Douglas L. Bridges)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 8/27/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2010 71 Facebook, Inc.'s ANSWER to 58 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Daniel M. Miller by Facebook, Inc. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 8/9/2010) Modified on 8/10/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2010 70 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 26, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER DENYING FACEBOOK'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 62 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 22, 2010 68 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 67 Reply to Opposition filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 67 Reply to Opposition re 62 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 15, 2010 66 Memorandum in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byDaniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock and D. Gill Sperlein in Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 8, 2010 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel M. Miller Proof of Service on Defendant Yeo. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Hancock, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 22, 2010 64 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Case did not settle. (Date Filed: 6/22/2010). (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2010)
June 21, 2010 63 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 62 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 62 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 62 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 17, 2010 61 Summons Issued as to Yao Wei Yeo. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 60 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Daniel M. Miller as to Yao Wei Yeo. (Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 3, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 6/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/3/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 58 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., Yao Wei Yeo. Filed byDaniel M. Miller. (Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 28, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 27, 2010 57 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/27/2010) re 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Daniel M. Miller, CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zimmerman for Mediation/Settlement Conference. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2011 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2011 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 55 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 1/31/2011. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 3/3/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/27/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 24, 2010 54 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW LOCAL COUNSEL TO ATTEND CMC AND ARGUE MOTION by Judge Alsup granting 53 Motion to Allow Local Counsel to Appear (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 21, 2010 53 MOTION Plaintiff's Local Counsel to Attend the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 21, 2010 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 20, 2010 51 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by Daniel M. Miller (Hancock, Brian) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 49 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup [denying 48 Motion to Continue]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 19, 2010 48 MOTION to Continue May 27, 2010 Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue CMC, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue CMC)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 6, 2010 47 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of 46 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 46 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 46 Memorandum in Opposition re 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 15, 2010 45 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2010 08:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 14, 2010 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Daniel M. Miller. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 31, 2010 43 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup granting 25 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 25, 2010 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 41 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 40 Brief Plaintiff's Response to Facebook's Supplemental Brief re Motion to Dismiss filed byDaniel M. Miller. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 22, 2010 39 Brief re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Brief re Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 18, 2010 38 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/18/2010) re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2010)
March 17, 2010 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Facebook, Inc., Yao Wei Yeo. Filed byDaniel M. Miller. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 4, 2010 36 Reply to Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 1, 2010 35 Letter from I. Neel Chatterjee re Written Request for Oral Argument. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 24, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. Motion Hearing on 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc. set for 3/18/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF BRIAN HANCOCK PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 32 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF DOUGLAS BRIDGES PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 31 MOTION for leave for Brian Hancock to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611042752.) filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 30 MOTION for leave for Douglas L. Bridges to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611042752.) filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 29 Memorandum in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daniel M. Miller. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 23, 2010 28 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS AND PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS Show Cause Response due by 2/24/2010.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 2, 2010 26 Request for Judicial Notice re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 28, 2010 24 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 28, 2010 23 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling ICMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2010 11:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 25, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/25/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 21 CLERKS NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 22, 2010 20 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request For Reassignment To A United States District Judge by Facebook, Inc. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 19 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2010 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 18 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:09-cv-02810. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 15, 2010 Civil Case Terminated. (bjh)
January 15, 2010 Case transferred electroncially to ND of CA, San Franciso. (bjh)
January 15, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER granting Defendant's 13 Motion to Transfer Case to the USDC ND CA, San Francisco Division. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 1/15/2010. (bjh)
January 7, 2010 16 Reply Brief in Suppot of its Motion to Transfer Venue re 13 filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Julio C. Avalos, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Julio C. Avalos, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Julio C. Avalos, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Julio C. Avalos, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Julio C. Avalos, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Julio C. Avalos)(Wright, Jason) Modified on 1/22/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 Submission of 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, to District Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (bjh)
December 21, 2009 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue re 13 filed by Daniel M. Miller. (Garrison, W.) Modified on 1/22/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2009 14 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, until 2 weeks after the Court enters its ruling on the 13 1404(a) Motion to Transfer, for Defendant Facebook, Inc. to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 12/3/09. (bjh)
December 2, 2009 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California with Brief In Support by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration of Tina Doshi, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Tina Doshi, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Tina Doshi, # 5 Declaration of Yvonne P. Greer, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Yvonne P. Greer, # 7 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Yvonne P. Greer)(Wright, Jason)
December 2, 2009 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Jason)
November 24, 2009 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julio C. Avalos o/b/o Defendant Facebook, INc. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 11/24/09. (bjh)
November 24, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. Gray o/b/o Defendant Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 11/24/09. (bjh)
November 23, 2009 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas J. Gray Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002444935), 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Julio C. Avalos Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002444963). Attorney Thomas J. Gray, Julio C. Avalos added appearing on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (cdg)
November 20, 2009 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Julio C. Avalos Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002444963)by Facebook, Inc.. (McNeil, William)
November 20, 2009 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas J. Gray Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002444935)by Facebook, Inc.. (McNeil, William)
November 2, 2009 Submission of 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, to District Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (bjh)
November 1, 2009 7 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER until 12/2/2009 for Defendant Facebook, Inc. Consent Motion granted/terminated: 6 for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Daniel M. Miller, Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 11/1/09. (bjh)
October 30, 2009 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daniel M. Miller, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Cover, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Consent Oder-Ex. A)(Bridges, Douglas)
October 26, 2009 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian D. Hancock o/b/o Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 10/26/09. (bjh)
October 26, 2009 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Complaint Miller v. Facebook, et al., as to Brenda Laws, Security Supervisor., Return of Service Executed by Facebook, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. served on 10/13/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Bridges, Douglas)
October 15, 2009 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian D. Hancock Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian Hancock added appearing on behalf of Daniel M. Miller (cdg)
October 13, 2009 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian D. Hancock Pro Hac Vice by Daniel M. Miller. Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #17231. (gar)
October 13, 2009 2 NOTICE Of Manual Filing Exhibits A & B re 1 Complaint by Daniel M. Miller (gar)
October 9, 2009 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Summons Issued); Jury Demand filed by Daniel M. Miller; and Summon(s) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 17178.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/22/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Miller
Represented By: Brian D. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Phillip Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yao Wei Yeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?