W. v. Menlo Park City School District
Plaintiff: Andrew W.
Defendant: Menlo Park City School District
Case Number: 3:2010cv00292
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION; GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE; DISMISSING SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; STRIKING THIRD THROUGH SIXTH CAUSES OF ACTION; STRIKING CLAIMS AGAINST OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING THE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION AND THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 25, 2010 to August 27, 2010, at which time the deadline to complete Early Neutral Evaluation will be set. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 3, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Case Management Conference is continued to June 25, 2010. Plaintiff is directed to file his First Amended Complaint, if any, no later than May 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION; VACATING APRIL 30, 2010 HEARING. The Second Cause of Action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. v. Menlo Park City School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew W.
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menlo Park City School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?