Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc. v. Ice Cream Distributors of Evansville, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.
Defendant: Ice Cream Distributors of Evansville, LLC and Spin City Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00317
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re Further Supplemental Briefing. Plaintiff shall file its supplemental papers by May 27, 2011. Defendants shall file responsive papers by June 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 109 Stipulation filed by Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/3/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING 104 Stipulation filed by Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO JUNE 8, 2011 AT 10:00 A.M.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/6/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Provisionally Granting 66 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Provisionally Granting 77 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Provisionally Granting 78 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING 71 Stipulation, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO APRIL 12, 2011 AT 10:00 A.M. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS DUE BY APRIL 5, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/22/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation and Order to Continue Motion for Summary Judgment and Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion for Summary Judgment 59 Hearing set for 3/23/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING (52 in 3:10-cv-00317-EMC) Stipulation filed by Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/6/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference reset to 1/12/2011 at 10:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/13/2010. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/28/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc. v. Ice Cream Distributors of Evansville, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.
Represented By: James G. Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ice Cream Distributors of Evansville, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Bracamontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spin City Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Bracamontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?