Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. Amaral & Sons, Inc.
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Defendant: Amaral & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00391
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION re 16 Letter filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/4/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF EXAMINATION re 13 Proposed Order filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/9/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 6 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/11/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE re 4 Proposed Order filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/30/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. Amaral & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaral & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?