Carrillo-Castro v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Martha Carrillo-Castro
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2010cv00460
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/26/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/16/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 19 (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/18/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/10/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrillo-Castro v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Carrillo-Castro
Represented By: Steven Gilberto Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?