Gray v. Central Mortgage Company et al
Plaintiff: Dorian W. Gray
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Patriot Financial Corporation, MTC Financial Inc. and Alvin Brown
Case Number: 3:2010cv00483
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 27 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE: 24 , 23 STIPULATIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/21/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE: 8 LIFTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/14/2010. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER RE: 8 AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/31/2010 at 10:10 a.m. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Central Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorian W. Gray
Represented By: Raymond Eugene Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?