Montenegro v. Wan Hai Lines (Singapore) PTE LTD
Plaintiff: Eric Montenegro
Defendant: Wan Hai Lines (Singapore) PTE LTD
Case Number: 3:2010cv00581
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Signed by Judge Joseph C Spero on 9/9/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING re 36 Stipulation and Order Setting Certain Pretrial Deadlines filed by Wan Hai Lines (Singapore) PTE LTD. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/10/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 4/22/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/28/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/21/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/08/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 1/28/11 at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 4/1/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/21/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION AND RE-SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 11/5/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/10/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montenegro v. Wan Hai Lines (Singapore) PTE LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Montenegro
Represented By: Patrick Brennen Streb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wan Hai Lines (Singapore) PTE LTD
Represented By: James Barton Nebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?