Digby Adler Group LLC v. Image Rent A Car, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Digby Adler Group, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Bandago LLC
Defendant: Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc., Gad Sebag and Shneior Zilberman
Case Number: 3:2010cv00617
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2015 Filing 156 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Digby Adler Group, LLC Against Image Rent A Car, Inc., In favor of Digby Adler Group, LLC Against Van Rental Co., Inc. by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 155 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 154 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Digby Adler Group, LLC against Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/22/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 15, 2015 Filing 153 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Consent Judgment Against Defendants Image Rent A Car, Inc. and Van Rental Co., Inc. Only filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Discovery due by 11/13/2015. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/25/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/06/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Samuel Conti: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/6/2015. Trial date and schedule set. Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2016, at 9:30 AM. Court will issue a Status Conference Order that includes all dates and deadlines. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney Jeffrey Rosenfeld. Defendant Attorney Steven Heath. This is a text only Minute Entry (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/6/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 150 SUBSEQUENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/26/2015) Modified on 2/27/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #122 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #134 Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
January 7, 2015 Filing 148 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Motion Hearings. The Motion Hearings, which have been noticed for Friday, 01/09/2015, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearings are hereby VACATED. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 6, 2015 Filing 147 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference previously scheduled for Friday, 01/09/2015. Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 31, 2014 Filing 146 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PORPOSED] ORDER ; filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/31/2014) Modified on 1/5/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2014 Filing 145 Declaration of Steven A. Heath in Support of #144 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byGad Sebag. (Related document(s) #144 ) (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 144 REPLY (re #134 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byGad Sebag. (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 143 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #142 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #142 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 142 RESPONSE (re #134 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #138 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document No. 123-2.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 140 STIPULATION re #138 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re. D.E. No. 123-2 filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 139 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #138 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re. D.E. No. 123-2 filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Related document(s) #138 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 138 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re. D.E. No. 123-2 filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 137 EXHIBITS re #136 Declaration in Support - Exhibits 11-13 (Revised to be Redacted) filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Related document(s) #136 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 136 Declaration of Jeffrey Rosenfeld in Support of #135 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Related document(s) #135 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 135 REPLY (re #122 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gad Sebag. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 12/16/2014. Replies due by 12/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 133 OBJECTIONS to re #123 Declaration in Support, of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Gad Sebag, Van Rental Co., Inc., Shneior Zilberman. (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 132 Declaration of Steven Schlackman in Support of #128 Opposition/Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Gad Sebag, Van Rental Co., Inc., Shneior Zilberman. (Related document(s) #128 ) (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 131 Declaration of Steven A. Heath in Support of #128 Opposition/Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Gad Sebag, Van Rental Co., Inc., Shneior Zilberman. (Related document(s) #128 ) (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 130 Declaration of Gad Sebag in Support of #128 Opposition/Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Gad Sebag, Van Rental Co., Inc., Shneior Zilberman. (Related document(s) #128 ) (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 129 Declaration of Schneior Zilberman in Support of #128 Opposition/Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Gad Sebag, Van Rental Co., Inc., Shneior Zilberman. (Related document(s) #128 ) (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 128 RESPONSE (re #122 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Gad Sebag, Van Rental Co., Inc., Shneior Zilberman. (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digby Adler Group, LLC re #125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 50 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 50 (Unredacted))(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 124 Declaration of Sharky Laguana in Support of #122 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 123 Declaration of Jeffrey Rosenfeld in Support of #122 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, *** # 2 Exhibit 11-13 DOCUMENT REMOVED PER COURT ORDER. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #3 Exhibit 14-20, #4 Exhibit 21-27, #5 Exhibit 28-30, #6 Exhibit 31-40, #7 Exhibit 41-44, #8 Exhibit 45-50, #9 Exhibit 51-53, #10 Exhibit 54-56, #11 Exhibit 57-60)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/17/2014) Modified on 12/10/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2014 Filing 122 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 12/1/2014. Replies due by 12/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #120 Stipulated Protective Order.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Kennedy, Conor) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/22/2014. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order - Discovery)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 118 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/19/2014 before Judge Samuel Conti. CASE REFERRED to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2015. Further Case Management Conference/Trial Setting set for 1/9/2015 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digby Adler Group, LLC (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 116 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER ; filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2014 Filing 115 ANSWER to #85 Amended Complaint byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Gad Sebag, Van Rental Co., Inc., Shneior Zilberman. (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 8/27/2014) Modified on 8/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #111 Stipulation to Set Aside Defaults of Defendants Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co. Inc., and Gad Sebag, and Set Deadline for All Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/22/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/22/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Set Aside Defaults And Set Deadline to Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Gad Sebag, Van Rental Co., Inc., Shneior Zilberman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heath, Steven) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE & [PROPOSED] ORDER of Substitution of Counsel by Steven Heath (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 8/21/2014) Modified on 8/22/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE & [PROPOSED] ORDER of Substitution of Counsel by Steven Heath (Heath, Steven) (Filed on 8/21/2014) Modified on 8/22/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2014 Filing 108 Mail sent to Richard P. Duane returned as undeliverable re #107 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti conditionally granting #101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard P. Duane and Levi Huebner terminated (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tmi, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2014 Filing 106 Clerks DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to Shneior Zilberman. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 105 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc. and Gad Sebag. (Related documents(s) #104 )(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 23, 2014 Filing 104 MOTION for Default by the Clerk as to Defendants Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc., Gad Sebag, and Shneior Zilberman filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld, #2 Exhibit A - N)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/24/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2014 Filing 103 Letter dated 07/09/14; from Shneior Zilberman re Substitution of Counsel. Per Chambers (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 102 Statement of Non-Opposition re #101 Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants filed byDigby Adler Group, LLC. (Related document(s) #101 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 101 Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/15/2014. Replies due by 7/22/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. Shneior Zilberman served on 4/7/2011, answer due 4/28/2011. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. Gad Sebag served on 4/6/2011, answer due 4/27/2011. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 98 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #96 Motion to Lift Stay (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION to Lift Stay re #90 Order Staying Case filed by Digby Adler Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/10/2014. Replies due by 6/17/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
November 3, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE of Change of Address by Karl Stephen Kronenberger - Notice of Change of Firm Name and Roster of Attorneys (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying #91 Motion to Lift Stay (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digby Adler Group LLC re #91 MOTION to Lift Stay as to Defendants Zilberman and Sebag ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #92 Declaration in Support, (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 92 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #91 MOTION to Lift Stay as to Defendants Zilberman and Sebag ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O)(Related document(s) #91 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 91 MOTION to Lift Stay as to Defendants Zilberman and Sebag ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Digby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER STAYING CASE, denying #84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/13/2011. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE by Digby Adler Group LLC - Notice of Defendants Image Rent A Car, Inc. and Van Rental Co.'s Filings of Bankruptcy Petitions (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
March 25, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #88 Order on Motion to Compel. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating hearing #78 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 Filing 87 Summons Issued as to Shneior Zilberman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 Filing 86 Summons Issued as to Gad Sebag. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 85 AMENDED COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint against Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc., Gad Sebag, Shneior Zilberman. Filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Gad Sebag, #2 Summons to Shneior Zilberman)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 84 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (Attachments: #1 Decleration of Levi Huebner, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affirmation of Service)(Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #66 Motion for Leave to File (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 82 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of #81 Reply to Opposition/Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Related document(s) #81 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 81 REPLY (re #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ) filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 80 RESPONSE (re #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ) Oppositon to Plaintiffs Motion filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 79 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #78 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-J)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 78 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Digby Adler Group LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #73 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The hearing date for Plaintff's motion for leave to amend its Complaint is continued to March 18, 2011. Defendants' opposition is due February 26, 2011; Plaintiff's reply is due March 5, 2011 (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 76 REPLY (re #73 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended ComplaintFirst MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ) filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 is continued to 3/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 75 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #74 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File its First Amended Complaint filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #74 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 74 Memorandum in Opposition re #73 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended ComplaintFirst MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 73 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 72 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 2/8/2011 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 2/8/2011). (Recording #TC 04-11.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re #68 Letter Brief filed by Digby Adler Group LLC, #69 Letter Brief filed by Van Rental Co., Inc., Image Rent A Car, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/4/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 70 Letter Brief re #69 Letter Brief regarding Plaintiff's Subpoenas filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Related document(s) #69 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 69 Letter Brief to Judge Zimmerman filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 68 Letter Brief to Judge Zimmerman Requesting Discovery Conference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 67 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Related document(s) #66 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Digby Adler Group LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 6, 2010 Filing 64 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/6/2010 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 12/6/2010). (Recording #TC 38-10.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2010)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/3/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 62 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 12/3/2010 before Judge Samuel Conti (Date Filed: 12/3/2010). Discovery due by 5/18/2011. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER CONTINUING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/23/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 60 Letter from Levi Huebner To Magistrate Zimmerman. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 12/6/2010 03:30 PM. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 59 CLERKS NOTICE: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/24/2010 09:00 AM. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 58 Letter Brief in Response to Defendants' Letter Brief regarding Discovery Matters filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 57 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 56 Letter Brief To Magistrate Zimmerman filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #54 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference from 11/19/10 to 12/3/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 18, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 11/19/10 is continued to 12/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION to Continue the Case Management Conference filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/22/2010 03:00 PM. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/17/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 51 Declaration of Levi Huebner in Support of Joint CMS filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 50 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 49 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of #48 Case Management Statement (Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement) filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 48 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - Plaintiff's Amended Case Management Statement filed by Digby Adler Group LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 47 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of #46 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and to Deem Matters Admitted, and Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(Related document(s) #46 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and to Deem Matters Admitted, and Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Digby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE by Digby Adler Group LLC re #43 MOTION to Strike #41 Answer to Complaint - Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Defendants' Answer and Request to Vacate Hearing (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 44 Amended ANSWER to Complaint byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION to Strike #41 Answer to Complaint filed by Digby Adler Group LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant has to 9/16/10 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint, Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 41 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 40 STIPULATION For Defendants To File An Answer To The Complaint by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 39 ADR Clerks Notice Re-Setting ADR Phone Conference to Wednesday, September 8, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. pacific time. The dial-in number is 641-715-3200 and the access code is 1007836. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 38 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: COUNSEL TO SUBMIT FOR FILING ALONG WITH THE APPEAL FEE A HARD COPY OF THE NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH THE CLERKS OFFICE NOTICE by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc. Notice of Appeal (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying #21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #21 Motion to Transfer Case (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
June 23, 2010 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 8/26/10 at 11:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 36 ADR Clerks Notice Re-Setting the ADR Phone Conference for 6/23/10 at 2:30 p.m. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - Joint Case Management Statement filed by Digby Adler Group LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 34 Proposed Order on #21 Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 Filing 33 DECLARATION OF LEVI HUEBNER filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc. (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 Filing 32 DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS #21 MOTION SEEKING TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICITON, IMPROPER VENUE AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK PUSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404; filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Decleration of Shneior Zilberman, #2 Decleration of Chanie Vilenkin)(Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 Filing 31 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/14/10 at 11:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 27 Declaration of Keeley Pederson in Support of #22 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 26 Declaration of Andrew Moore in Support of #22 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 25 Declaration of Guy Higbey in Support of #22 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 24 Declaration of Sharky Laguana in Support of #22 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 23 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #22 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-G, #3 Exhibit H (Part 1), #4 Exhibit H (Part 2), #5 Exhibit I-L, #6 Exhibit M-T)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition re #21 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case - Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Venue filed byDigby Adler Group LLC. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 10, 2010 Filing 21 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Decleration of Levi Huebner, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #4 Decleration of Gad Sebag)(Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due by 5/10/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 10, 2010 Filing 19 Renotice motion hearing filed byImage Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decleration of Levi Huebner in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 4/10/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Huebner, Levi) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #15 Motion for admission of Attorney Levi Huebner to appear in Pro Hac Vice (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Duane (Duane, Richard) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Levi Huebner to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611043859.) filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Second Motion to Dismiss; Denying Motion for Enlargement of Time (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2010: #1 proof of service) (tdm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digby Adler Group LLC re #12 Notice (Other) - Notice of Deposit of Registrar Certificate (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE by Digby Adler Group LLC - Notice of Deposit of Registrar Certificate (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings or Answer filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 10 Letter dated 3/12/10: from SN Zilberman re Defendant(s) Motion to Dismiss. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2010: #1 proof of service) (tdm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digby Adler Group LLC. Van Rental Co., Inc. served on 2/25/2010, answer due 3/18/2010. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digby Adler Group LLC. Image Rent A Car, Inc. served on 2/25/2010, answer due 3/18/2010. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc.. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2010: #1 Van Rental Co) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Digby Adler Group LLC (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Image Rent A Car, Inc., Van Rental Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611042296, summons issued.). Filed by Digby Adler Group LLC. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2010: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2015: #2 Receipt) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digby Adler Group LLC v. Image Rent A Car, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digby Adler Group, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Bandago LLC
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Conor Hughes Kennedy
Represented By: Henry M. Burgoyne, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image Rent A Car, Inc.
Represented By: Levi Huebner
Represented By: Steven Alan Heath
Represented By: Richard P. Duane
Represented By: SN Zilberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Rental Co., Inc.
Represented By: Levi Huebner
Represented By: Steven Alan Heath
Represented By: Es Colin
Represented By: Richard P. Duane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gad Sebag
Represented By: Steven Alan Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shneior Zilberman
Represented By: Steven Alan Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?