Catchings v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: Rufus Catchings
Defendant: Ken Salazar, Marcia McNutt and Anne Kinsinger
Case Number: 3:2010cv00625
Filed: February 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/14/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document from Docket Entry Nos. 40 and 50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/07/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEF ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AS MODIFIED. The hearing on the motion to compel will be 8/23/2011 at 9:00 AM. Opposition due 7/26/2011. Reply due 8/2/2011, re doc 53 Stipulation filed by Ken Salazar. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/31/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 26 Stipulation filed by Rufus Catchings Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 6/14/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/29/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Scheduling Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/28/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 Stipulation filed by Rufus Catchings Settlement Conference set for 4/5/2011 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/14/10. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER permitting plaintiff to file a first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/05/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catchings v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus Catchings
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Kinsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?