Glaxo Group Limited et al v. Genentech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GlaxoSmithKline LLC. and Glaxo Group Limited
Defendant: Genentech, Inc. and City of Hope
Case Number: 3:2010cv00675
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated pursuant to #18 Order on Motion to Transfer Case. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 19 Transferred to the USDC-Central California. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #11 Motion to Transfer Case. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim byGlaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC.. (Galvin, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 2, 2010 Filing 16 Declaration of Daralyn J. Durie in Support of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer filed byCity of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 Filing 15 Reply Memorandum re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byCity of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byGlaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Victoria Q. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22)(Galvin, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 13 Declaration of Mark Lemley in Support of #11 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byCity of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 12 Declaration of Daralyn J. Durie in Support of #11 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byCity of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, First COUNTERCLAIM against Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC. byGenentech, Inc., City of Hope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC. of Order Setting Case Management Conference and Requiring Joint Case Management Conference Statement on City of Hope (Galvin, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC. of Order Setting Case Management Conference and Requiring Joint Case Management Conference Statement on Genentech, Inc. (Galvin, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 1, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC. of Summons and Complaint on City of Hope (Galvin, Robert) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
March 1, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC. of Summons and Complaint on Genentech, Inc. (Galvin, Robert) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 19, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2010.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/19/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC. identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC.. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Hope, Genentech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611042489, summons issued.). Filed by Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Summons Issued as to City of Hope, Genentech, Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaxo Group Limited et al v. Genentech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GlaxoSmithKline LLC.
Represented By: Lloyd R. Day, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M. Galvin
Represented By: Jackie Naomi Nakamura,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glaxo Group Limited
Represented By: Lloyd R. Day, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M. Galvin
Represented By: Jackie Naomi Nakamura,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hope
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?