Davenport v. Litton Loan Servicing LP et al
Plaintiff: Karol Davenport
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP, Wilmington Finance, Credit-Based Asset Servicing and Securizitation LLC, Commonwealth Land Title Company, U.S. Bank, North America, First Financial & Real Estate Services and Quality Loan Service Corp.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00679
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maryland Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on February 5, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE: MOTION TO EXPUNGE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/14/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/30/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE: 64 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/3/11.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE: 54 APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/29/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2010 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/12/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE: 27 DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS AS PREMATURE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/30/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: 9 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/16/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/9/2010 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 05/07/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport v. Litton Loan Servicing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karol Davenport
Represented By: Hermin Adella Dowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP
Represented By: Erik Wayne Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit-Based Asset Servicing and Securizitation LLC
Represented By: Erik Wayne Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, North America
Represented By: Erik Wayne Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial & Real Estate Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Represented By: Renee Reyes De Golier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?